Original Case: 1:18-cv-05292

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-01966
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Terminated:Nov 10, 2022
Last checked: Friday Nov 04, 2022 4:16 PM EDT
Amicus Curiae
New York Legal Assistance Group Inc.
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Italian Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence
Represented By
Justine Stringer
Krauss Shaknes Tallentire & Messeri LLP
contact info
Valentina Shaknes
Krauss Shaknes Tallentire & Messeri LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Dean Jeffrey L. Edleson, Ph.D.
Represented By
Timothy S. Durst
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Professor Evan Stark, Ph.D.
Represented By
Timothy S. Durst
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence
Represented By
Timothy S. Durst
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
National Association of Social Workers
Represented By
Timothy S. Durst
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Organization for Autism Research
Represented By
Timothy S. Durst
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Safe Horizon, Inc.
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
New York State Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
National Network to End Domestic Violence
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Merle Weiner, Philip H. Knight Professor of Law, University of Oregon School of Law
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Legal Momentum, The Women's Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
National Family Violence Law Center at the George Washington University Law School
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Georgetown Law Domestic Violence Clinic
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Battered Mothers Custody Conference
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Sanctuary for Families, Inc.
Represented By
Carolyn Frances Corwin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Tyler Jankauskas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Ryan Roberts
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Catherine Carulas
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
Isacco Jacky Saada
Represented By
Robert D. Arenstein
Law Offices of Robert D. Arenstein
contact info
Richard Min
Green Kaminer Min & Rockmore LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
Narkis Aliza Golan
Represented By
Kevin Grossinger
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info
Daniel H. Levi
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Karen King
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info
Daniel P. Gordon
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info
Chelsea L. Scism
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/01/2022 9:45 AM EST
Thursday, September 08, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. [3378894] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 03:37 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 24 pgs Case FILED
2 2 20 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3378897] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 03:40 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3378899] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 03:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 24 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15917626, FILED.[3378906] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 03:43 PM]
Related: [-]
10 10 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Mr. Robert D. Arenstein, Esq. for Appellee Isacco Jacky Saada, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3378965] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 04:17 PM]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 09/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3379075] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 07:08 PM]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 09/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3379076] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 07:11 PM]
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 09/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3379077] 22-1966 [Entered: 09/08/2022 07:14 PM]
Related: [-]