Original Case: 1:19-cv-00010

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02670
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Terminated:Jan 04, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jan 05, 2023 3:30 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
MIDLAND MORTGAGE CO
Represented By
David S. Gunter
Nelson Mullins
contact info
Phillip A. Giordano
Gordon Fournaris & Mammarella
contact info
Lyndsey A. Stults
Nelson Mullins
contact info
Kevin P. Polansky
Nelson Mullins
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SAFEGUARD PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By
Delia A. Clark
Rawle & Henderson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CATHERINE MULLANE
Represented By
Catherine Mullane
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/05/2023 3:30 AM EST
Thursday, September 08, 2022
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Catherine Mullane in District Court No. 1-19-cv-00010. (SB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order
Att: 3 13 pgs District Court Opinion
Att: 4 1 pgs District Court Judgment
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order
Att: 7 2 pgs Case Opening Letter