Original Case: 1:19-cv-03506

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cvus-05236
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2022
Terminated:Apr 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Nada Culver, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of the United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By
Ezekiel Peterson
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Andrew Marshall Bernie
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
United States Bureau of Land Management, an agency of the United States
Represented By
Ezekiel Peterson
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Andrew Marshall Bernie
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Friends of Animals
Represented By
Stephen Russel Hernick
Friends of Animals
contact info
Jennifer Elaine Best
Friends of Animals
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2023 4:32 AM EDT
Monday, September 12, 2022
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 22-5236
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1963158] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03506-CKK filed by Friends of Animals. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5236 22-5236
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1963174] filed consolidating cases 22-5236 (Cross-appeal started 09/12/2022) with 22-5227 directing party to file in 22-5236 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/12/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/12/2022 22-5227 22-5236
Related: [-]