Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:22-cv-00143
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2022
Terminated:Feb 15, 2023
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF TAYLOR COUNTY, 22-CV-062
Last checked: Monday Mar 13, 2023 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
JUAN DELAERUEZ
Represented By
KENNETH SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD
contact info
TRACE SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
Defendant
MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS
Represented By
KENNETH SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD
contact info
TRACE SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
Defendant
TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS
Represented By
KENNETH SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD
contact info
TRACE SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
Defendant
TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
KENNETH SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD
contact info
TRACE SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
Defendant
W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS
Represented By
KENNETH SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD
contact info
TRACE SEXTON
Bank Of America Plaza
contact info
Plaintiff
MAURICE SMITH
Represented By
BRANDON MARCELLUS PRICE-CRUM
contact info
ADRIAN CRITTENTON
contact info
Plaintiff
RONNIE TOWNSEND
Represented By
BRANDON MARCELLUS PRICE-CRUM
contact info
ADRIAN CRITTENTON
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/15 4:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS, JUAN DELAERUEZ, MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS as to All Parties (SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
utility REMARK Wed 02/15 5:13 PM
REMARK : In light of17 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 12/14 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by JUAN DELAERUEZ, MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/21 1:48 PM
NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS OFFER OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO O.C.G.A. § 9-11-68 by JUAN DELAERUEZ, MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS (SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 11/09 8:16 AM
Notice of Deficiency; Related document:13 Motion to Stay, filed by MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS, JUAN DELAERUEZ; Notice to Counsel: Adrian Crittenton . The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e-mail address via PACER (tlf)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 11/09 11:08 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting13 Motion to Stay. If the parties do not resolve this action during mediation, then their joint proposed scheduling order is due by December 14, 2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/9/2022 (CCL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
13 13 motion Stay Tue 11/08 5:05 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation by JUAN DELAERUEZ, MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS filed by KENNETH SEXTON.(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Stay Pending Mediation
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
12 12 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Wed 09/28 9:13 AM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ADRIAN CRITTENTON (nop)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
11 11 11 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Tue 09/27 1:23 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 11/8/2022 . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 9/27/2022 (tlf)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/27 12:32 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # CGAMDC-4194751, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Brandon Price-Crum 427025.(CRITTENTON, ADRIAN) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/27/2022) (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/21 4:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/21 4:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS with Jury Demand.(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/21 4:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS with Jury Demand.(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/21 4:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by JUAN DELAERUEZ with Jury Demand.(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/21 4:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS with Jury Demand.(SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 09/20 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD on behalf of All Defendants Attorney WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD added to party JUAN DELAERUEZ(pty:dft), Attorney WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD added to party MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS(pty:dft), Attorney WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD added to party TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS(pty:dft), Attorney WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD added to party TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney WILLIAM DANIEL FLOYD added to party W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS(pty:dft)(FLOYD, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
3 3 misc Jurisdictional Statement Wed 09/14 5:19 PM
Jurisdictional Statement by JUAN DELAERUEZ, MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS (SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/14 4:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUAN DELAERUEZ, MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS (SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/14 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4183865, $402 filed by All Defendants All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (SEXTON, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Taylor County Superior Court Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of Civil Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Trace Sexton,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
NOTICE TO COUNSEL BRANDON PRICE-CRUM: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements (tlf).
Related: [-]
Notice of Deficiency; Related document:1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS, JUAN DELAERUEZ ); In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be separately filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2 and the CM/ ECF administrative procedures manual at page 11 (tlf).
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Wed 09/14 4:44 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL BRANDON PRICE-CRUM: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements (tlf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 09/14 5:00 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Related document:1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MARIO ALBERTO LEAL-SALAS, TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, W FREIGHT SOLUTIONS, JUAN DELAERUEZ ); In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be separately filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2 and the CM/ ECF administrative procedures manual at page 11 (tlf)
Related: [-]