Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:22-bk-13307
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Aug 30, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Las Vegas Skydiving Adventures LLC
1110 Airport Rd.
Overton, NV 89040
Represented By
JAMES T. LEAVITT
Leavitt Legal Services, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
265 265 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JUSTIN CHARLES VALENCIA on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 Related [+] (VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 262 Notice of Entry of Order filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11,263 Notice of Entry of Order filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11,264 Notice of Entry of Order filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
264 264 trustee Notice of Entry of Order Tue 05/06 2:49 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Related [+](VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 260 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
263 263 trustee Notice of Entry of Order Tue 05/06 2:44 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Related [+](VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 259 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
262 262 trustee Notice of Entry of Order Tue 05/06 2:43 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Related [+](VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 258 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
261 261 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 2:16 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JUSTIN CHARLES VALENCIA on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 Related [+] (VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 255 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11,256 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11,257 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
Monday, May 05, 2025
260 260 order Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk) Mon 05/05 9:06 AM
Order Approving Joint Stipulation Withdrawing Motion For Entry Of Final Decree And Closing Case Related [+] (mms)
Related: [-] 257 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.
259 259 order Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk) Mon 05/05 9:04 AM
Order Approving Joint Stipulation Vacating Order Granting Motion For Entry Of Final Decree And Order Closing Case Related [+] (mms)
Related: [-] 256 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.
258 258 order Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk) Mon 05/05 9:00 AM
Order Approving Joint Stipulation Withdrawing Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee's No Distribution Report Related [+] (mms)
Related: [-] 255 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.
Thursday, May 01, 2025
257 257 misc Stipulation Thu 05/01 1:41 PM
Stipulation By U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 and Between the Debtor JOINT STIPULATION WITHDRAWING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DECREE AND CLOSING CASE Filed by JUSTIN CHARLES VALENCIA on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 Related [+] (VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 237 Final Decree filed by Debtor LAS VEGAS SKYDIVING ADVENTURES LLC
256 256 misc Stipulation Thu 05/01 12:11 PM
Joint Stipulation By U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 and Between Subchapter V Trustee, Edward M. Burr, and the Debtor JOINT STIPULATION VACATING ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DECREE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE Filed by JUSTIN CHARLES VALENCIA on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 Related [+] (VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 243 Order on Motion for Final Decree
255 255 misc Stipulation Thu 05/01 10:41 AM
Joint Stipulation By U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 and Between Subchapter V Trustee, Edward M. Burr JOINT STIPULATION WITHDRAWING CHAPTER 11 SUBCHAPTER V TRUSTEES NO DISTRIBUTION REPORT Filed by JUSTIN CHARLES VALENCIA on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 Related [+] (VALENCIA, JUSTIN)
Related: [-] 244 Ch. 11 Subch V Trustees Report of No Distribution F-non-consensual plan consummated, fees awarded filed by Trustee EDWARD M. BURR