YOUNG et al v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Kirsch |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-05502 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 11, 2023 4:40 AM EST |
Defendant
MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MERISSA JONES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEWIS YOUNG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KIA WATSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACKIE RASMUSSEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ENRIQUE PEREZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VALERIU MATEI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MUHAMMED JACKSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TERESA ISOM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREA GEOLY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEVANDA GAYDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEITH COLWELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARL CLARK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SIRO BRENES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDA BLACKWELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
AMIR CRAWFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
KRISHNAKANT KHETAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 7/14/2023. (jdg) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 07/14 10:45 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jdg) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (CECCHI, JAMES) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/30 9:26 AM
Set Deadlines as to24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint . Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint by MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC.(COUTU, LISA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/15 3:31 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Kirsch for all further proceedings. Judge Zahid N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/15/2023. (kht) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() COMPLAINT against MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14239441) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SIRO BRENES, KIA WATSON, ENRIQUE PEREZ, LEWIS YOUNG, ANDREA GEOLY, LINDA BLACKWELL, KRISHNAKANT KHETAN, MERISSA JONES, LEVANDA GAYDEN, CARL CLARK, KEITH COLWELL, AMIR CRAWFORD, MUHAMMED JACKSON, VALERIU MATEI, TERESA ISOM.(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER consolidating cases 2:22-cv-05799 and 3:22-cv-05877. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/10/2023. (jal, ) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order
Thu 02/09 12:35 PM
TEXT ORDER that by no later than 02/24/2023, Defendants shall file any Motion to Dismiss, limited to the bases articulated in their pre-motion letter13 . So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/9/2023. (kas) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Substitution of Attorney - Attorney PAUL DAVID ERIAN terminated. Attorney LISA MARIE COUTU for MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP,LISA MARIE COUTU for MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC added.. (COUTU, LISA) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Eric J. Knapp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/25/2023. (jal, ) |
|
16 | 16
![]() CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Troy M. Yoshino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/25/2023. (jal, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric J. Knapp, Esq. for by MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC.(ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Troy M. Yoshino, Esq. for by MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC.(ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Letter from Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Mercedes-Benz Group AG Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() LETTER ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/18/2022. (mg ) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC identifying Mercedes-Benz North America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL DAVID ERIAN on behalf of MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP (ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Mon 10/17 3:20 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer8 submitted by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/27/2022. (kht) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL DAVID ERIAN on behalf of MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (ERIAN, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BARTLETT, CAROLINE) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. CECCHI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CECCHI, JAMES) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to MERCEDES-BENZ GROUP, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) |
|
qc
QC - Updating Account
Wed 09/14 12:43 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint1 submitted by Christopher Seeger on 9/12/2022, Scott A. George appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (kht) |
||
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 09/14 12:28 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht) |