Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00096
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2022
Last checked: Friday Sep 16, 2022 3:47 AM EDT
Defendant
John Edward Lohden, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Scott C. Cox
Cox & Mazzoli, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alicia P. Gomez
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info
Ann Marie Blaylock
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/16/2022 4:19 AM EDT
Friday, July 15, 2022
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay as to Seal 1 (1). (DJT) [3:22-mj-00412-CHL *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Complaint
2 2 Sealed Document (DJT) [3:22-mj-00412-CHL *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (DJT) [3:22-mj-00412-CHL *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/15/22; granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Seal 1 (1) cc: AUSA(DJT) [3:22-mj-00412-CHL *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
5 5 INDICTMENT as to Seal 1 (1) count(s) 1. (DJT)
Related: [-]
6 6 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED DOCUMENT:Non-Redacted Indictment re5 Indictment (DJT)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Alicia P. Gomez appearing for USA. (DJT)
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Seal 1. (DJT)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/17/22; granting10 Motion to Seal Case as to Seal 1 (1) cc: AUSA (DJT)
Related: [-]