Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 4:22-cv-01667
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Terminated:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2023 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Deputy Hocevar
in his individual capacity c/o Mahoning County Jail 110 Fifth Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Represented By
Helen K. Sudhoff
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Daniel T. Downey
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Defendant
Nurse Lewis
in her individual capacity .c/o Mahoning County Jail 110 Fifth Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Defendant
Mahoning County, Ohio
110 Fifth Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Represented By
Helen K. Sudhoff
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Daniel T. Downey
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Defendant
Nurse Smith
in her individual capacity c/o Mahoning County Jail 110 Fifth Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Defendant
Nurse Van Dyke
in her individual capacity c/o Mahoning County Jail 110 Fifth Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Defendant
John J. Vargo, D.O.
in his individual capacity 20 Ohltown Road
Austintown, OH 44515
Defendant
Nurse Wallace
in her individual capacity c/o Mahoning County Jail 110 Fifth Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44503
Defendant
Wellpath
Plaintiff
Linda Fekety
in her capacity as the Administratrix of the Estate of James Kennedy III, Deceased 1675 Weston
Youngstown, OH 44514
Represented By
David L. Engler
contact info

GPO Oct 12 2023
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated herein, the motion to dismiss filed by Mahoning County and Deputy Hocevar (Doc. No. 9) is GRANTED. Mahoning County and Deputy Hocevar are dismissed as parties from this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 10/12/2023. (H,AR)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/15 11:42 AM
Order of Case Dismissal: On October 12, 2023, this Court entered an Order dismissing with prejudice the claims against defendants Deputy Jacob Hocevar and Mahoning County. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and this Court's Order dated October 13, 2023, all remaining claims and parties in this action are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. This case is closed. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 11/15/2023. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
order Order Fri 10/13 10:10 AM
Order [non-document]: Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) requires a plaintiff to serve a summons and complaint upon a defendant within 90 days after the complaint is filed. To date, no proof of service regarding Wellpath and the individual medical professional defendants has been filed. No later than 10 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall show good cause why service of the summons and complaint was not timely made upon all defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m). Absent such a showing, the action will be dismissed without prejudice as to non-served defendants for failure to prosecute. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 10/13/2023. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 11 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Thu 10/12 11:31 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated herein, the motion to dismiss filed by Mahoning County and Deputy Hocevar (Doc. No.9 ) is GRANTED. Mahoning County and Deputy Hocevar are dismissed as parties from this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 10/12/2023. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
12 12 resp Response Tue 01/24 4:15 PM
Response to9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Defendants' Response in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Deputy Hocevar, Mahoning County, Ohio. (Sudhoff, Helen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
11 11 resp Response Tue 01/10 4:51 PM
Response to9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Linda Fekety. (Engler, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Wed 12/28 11:16 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until January 10, 2023, to respond to Defendants Deputy Hocevar and Mahoning County, Ohio's motion to dismiss. (Doc. No.10 .) Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 12/28/2022. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 26, 2022
10 10 motion Extension (of deadlines) Mon 12/26 5:27 PM
Motion for extension of Response to Motion to Dismiss until January 10, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Linda Fekety. Related document(s)9 . (Engler, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/28 1:46 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Deputy Hocevar, Mahoning County, Ohio. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/28 1:34 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Deputy Hocevar, Mahoning County, Ohio. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
7 7 order Initial Order Wed 11/16 12:50 PM
Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 11/16/2022. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 10/20 11:16 AM
Attorney Appearance by Helen K. Sudhoff filed by on behalf of Deputy Hocevar, Mahoning County, Ohio. (Sudhoff, Helen)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 10/20 11:13 AM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel T. Downey filed by on behalf of Deputy Hocevar, Mahoning County, Ohio. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/20 10:11 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Linda Fekety. Mahoning County, Ohio waiver sent on 10/18/2022, answer due 12/19/2022 filed on behalf of Linda Fekety (Engler, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/20 10:09 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Linda Fekety. Deputy Hocevar waiver sent on 10/18/2022, answer due 12/19/2022 filed on behalf of Linda Fekety (Engler, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 09/19 2:49 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Deputy Hocevar, Nurse Lewis, Mahoning County, Ohio, Nurse Smith, Nurse Van Dyke, John J. Vargo, D.O., Nurse Wallace, Wellpath. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/19 1:37 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11622360.. Filed by Linda Fekety. (Engler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Wellpath,
Att: 3 Summons Dr. Vargo,
Att: 4 Summons Deputy Hovecar,
Att: 5 Summons Nurse Smith,
Att: 6 Summons Nurse Wallace,
Att: 7 Summons Nurse Van Dyke,
Att: 8 Summons Nurse Lewis,
Att: 9 Summons Mahoning County, Ohio
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 09/19 2:11 PM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 09/19 2:13 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]