Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ricardo S Martinez
Case #: 2:22-cv-01319
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2023 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Michael W Bugni
Defendant
Michael W Bugni and Associates
Plaintiff
Azeb Alemayehu
1167 REPUBLICAN STREET APT 403
SEATTLE, WA 98109


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Document(s) Wed 01/08 1:12 PM
PROPOSED Application for Court-Appointed Cousel, filed by Plaintiff Azeb Alemayehu. (TE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/28 12:19 PM
***Civil Case Terminated for failure to cure3 IFP Deficiency. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 09/19 12:28 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/19/2022 to correct IFP application (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/19 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Michael Bugni, Michael Bugni and Associates with JURY DEMAND, filed by Azeb Alemayehu.(MJV) (Fee Pending)
Related: [-]