Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:22-cv-03456
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Terminated:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2023 4:45 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Niedax Monosystems, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Jaye Johnson
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael J. Meyer, Jr.
contact info
Gregory Thomas Frohman
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Counter Defendant
Buzzard Corporation
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jordan Handler
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mono-Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Counter Defendant
Zorba Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Defendant
Niedax Monosystems, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Jaye Johnson
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael J. Meyer, Jr.
contact info
Gregory Thomas Frohman
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Plaintiff
Buzzard Corporation
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Handler
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Plaintiff
Mono-Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info
Plaintiff
Zorba Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Victor A Walton, Jr
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Alexander
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Wojciech Jackowski
Offit Kurman
contact info
Alexander Mirkin
Offit Kurman
contact info

GPO Oct 26 2023
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Bench Trial set for 10/21/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 311 - Columbus before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Settlement Conference set for 9/3/2024 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus.. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/26/2023. (Attachments: # (1) FPTO Form) (cmw)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, March 14, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/14 11:38 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/13 3:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Mono-Systems, Inc.. (Mirkin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
30 30 misc Status Report Fri 03/01 4:56 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc., Zorba Industries, Inc.. (Mirkin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
29 29 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Thu 02/01 10:38 AM
ORDER - The Parties notified the Court on January 31, 2024 that they have reached a settlement. The Parties are DIRECTED to file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days of the issuance of this Order or file a status report on the docket regarding the status of settlement. The trial date and all associated deadlines set in Order Setting Trial Date and Settlement Conference (ECF No.26 ) are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/1/2024. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
28 28 order Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 10/30 11:27 AM
Notation ORDER Granting27 Joint Motion to Vacate Notice Designating Mediator. Elizabeth A McNellie no longer assigned as mediator to this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/30/2023. (sln)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
27 27 motion Vacate Fri 10/27 5:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate Notice Designating Mediator, by Plaintiffs Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc., Zorba Industries, Inc.. (Mirkin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
26 26 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/26 11:52 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Bench Trial set for 10/21/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 311 - Columbus before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Settlement Conference set for 9/3/2024 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus.. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/26/2023. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FPTO Form
Friday, October 13, 2023
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/13 1:04 PM
Joint MOTION Modify Case Schedule and Continue Trial Date re22 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,20 Scheduling Order, by Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc.. (Meyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Michael J. Meyer,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Proposed Order
med Notice Designating Mediator Fri 10/13 9:21 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Elizabeth A McNellie assigned as mediator to this case. Previously assigned mediator is unavailable. Within 14 days, the new mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in November 2023, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
med Notice Designating Mediator Mon 10/02 9:19 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Donald M Collins assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in November 2023, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
24 24 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Tue 09/19 8:45 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in November 2023 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 9/29/2023 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 07/28 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory Thomas Frohman (Frohman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/05 4:06 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Modify Case Schedule. Discovery due by 10/27/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2024. Primary Expert due by 11/30/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 1/8/2024. Settlement Demand due by 10/30/2023. Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 5, 2023. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/30 5:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Modify Case Schedule re16 Preliminary Pretrial Order,,20 Scheduling Order, by Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc.. (Meyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Friday, May 12, 2023
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/12 9:25 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Jury Trial set for 6/10/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 311 - Columbus before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Motions in Limine due by 5/13/2024. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/12/2023. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FPTO Form
Friday, February 17, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/17 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Jaye Johnson for Counter Claimant Niedax Monosystems, Inc., Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc. (Johnson, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
18 18 19 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 12/27 9:58 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 27, 2022. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
17 17 motion Protective Order Fri 12/23 3:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by Counter Claimant Niedax Monosystems, Inc., Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc.. (Meyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
16 16 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Tue 12/13 4:01 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the following schedule: Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2023. Motions to Amend due by 7/1/2023. Initial Disclosures due by 12/16/2022. Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 12/23/2022. Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2023. Primary Expert due by 8/31/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/29/2023. Settlement Demand due by 8/1/2023. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/16/2023. Mediation Deadline: 11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 13, 2022. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/12 1:30 PM
NOTICE : The PPTC set for 12/15/2022 is VACATED. (See ECF14 .) (sln)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 12/09 4:22 PM
ANSWER to12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc., Zorba Industries, Inc.. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 12/09 10:47 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Defendants Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc., Plaintiffs Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc.. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Protocol for Document Production
Monday, November 21, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/21 7:47 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 11/18 4:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Niedax Monosystems, Inc.. (Meyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/18 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Frohman for Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc. (Frohman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/18 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Meyer, Jr for Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc. (Meyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/18 10:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Niedax Monosystems, Inc.. (Meyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10/18 12:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Niedax Monosystems, Inc. on 9/19/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/03 10:38 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Mono-Systems, Inc. to Court (Mirkin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/27 9:43 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting5 and6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wojciech Jackowski and Alexander Mirkin as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 09/27/2022. (tla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
6 6 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/21 11:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9056721) of Alexander Mirkin by Plaintiffs Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc., Zorba Industries, Inc.. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/21 11:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9056692) of Wojciech Jackowski by Plaintiffs Buzzard Corporation, Jordan Handler, Mono-Systems, Inc., Zorba Industries, Inc.. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 19, 2022
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/19 3:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Zorba Industries, Inc.. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/19 3:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Buzzard Corporation. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/19 3:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mono-Systems, Inc.. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/19 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Niedax Monosystems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9053308), filed by Mono-Systems, Inc., Jordan Handler, Zorba Industries, Inc., Buzzard Corporation. (Walton, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet