Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: David A Sanders
Case #: 1:22-cv-00132
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Terminated:Nov 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2023 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Aaron Andrews
Represented By
Howard David Clark, III
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Jason Thomas Marsh
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
City of Columbus, Mississippi
Represented By
Howard David Clark, III
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Jason Thomas Marsh
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-30
Defendant
Christopher Ware
Represented By
Howard David Clark, III
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Jason Thomas Marsh
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Guyse
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Hosford
Hosford Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/09 4:03 PM
Agreed Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 04/09/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] g
Monday, April 08, 2024
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/08 11:27 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal . (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/07 3:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE due to settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/7/2023. (spw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
36 36 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 11/07 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Settlement Conference held on 11/6/2023. Parties reached a settlement agreement. (jf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
35 35 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 10/23 9:43 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Jones by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Michael Guyse (Wilson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
34 34 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 10/23 9:42 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Aaron Andrew by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Michael Guyse (Wilson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
33 33 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 10/23 9:42 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Ware by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Michael Guyse (Wilson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
32 32 notice Notice of Service Fri 09/29 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Municipal Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware to Plaintiff. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
31 31 notice Notice of Conference Tue 09/19 2:07 PM
NOTICE resetting Conference: Settlement Conference reset for 11/6/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Confidential memos due by 10/30/23. (cs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
notice Notice Cancelling Conference/Hearing/Trial Mon 09/18 2:17 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference for 9/28/23 at parties' request. Notice resetting conference to follow. No document attached. (cs)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
30 30 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 09/15 1:07 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting29 Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery and Motions Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/1/2023. Motions due by 11/15/2023. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/15/23. (No document attached.) (cs)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/15 11:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) Discovery and Motions Deadlines by Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Service Thu 09/07 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Municipal Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware to Plaintiff. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
27 27 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 08/31 1:42 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, Michael Guyse by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Service Tue 08/08 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of Michael Guyse to All Defendants. (Wilson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Conference Wed 08/02 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference reset for 9/28/2023 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Confidential memos due by 9/21/23. (cs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
notice Notice Cancelling Conference/Hearing/Trial Tue 08/01 4:22 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference at parties' request. Conference to be reset by further notice. No document attached. (cs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 07/06 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/29 11:21 AM
NOTICE by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Subpoena Duces Tecum (Deloach Counseling Services)
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/29 11:19 AM
NOTICE by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Subpoena Duces Tecum (Baptist Memorial Hospital)
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/29 11:17 AM
NOTICE by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Subpoena Duces Tecum (ARCH Global Precision)
Friday, June 02, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Service Fri 06/02 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Jeffrey J. Hosford on behalf of Michael Guyse to Defendant's City of Columbus, Mississippi, Aaron Andrews, Christopher Ware and John Does 1-30. (Hosford, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Service Wed 03/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Municipal Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware to Plaintiff. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/01 5:17 PM
NOTICE by Jeffrey J. Hosford on behalf of Michael Guyse of Service of Municipal Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information (Hosford, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Trial Wed 03/01 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before Senior Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3-4 days) (spw)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Service Wed 03/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Municipal Defendants' Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware to Plaintiff. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
15 15 order Case Management Order Mon 02/27 10:34 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2024 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 9/22/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/26/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/21/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/25/2023. Motions due by 10/6/2023. Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2023 at 01:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/27/2023. (jf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference Fri 02/24 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/24/2023. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Thu 01/26 11:04 AM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2023 at 9:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 2/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/26/2023. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/05 11:10 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware. (Marsh, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/06 1:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey J. Hosford on behalf of Michael Guyse All Plaintiffs. (Hosford, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/06 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey J. Hosford on behalf of Michael Guyse All Plaintiffs. (Hosford, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/06 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey J. Hosford on behalf of Michael Guyse All Plaintiffs. (Hosford, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Tue 12/06 11:16 AM
THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re6 Summons Returned Executed; Attorney directed to refile return to include copy of issued summons. (jla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
notice Notice of Correction Mon 11/28 2:06 PM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re6 Summons Returned Executed; Attorney to refile return to include copy of issued summons. (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
notice Notice of Correction Tue 11/22 9:57 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re6 Summons Returned Executed; Attorney to refile return to include copy of issued summons. (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/15 4:30 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Unopposed) or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint. Aaron Andrews answer due 1/5/2023; City of Columbus, Mississippi answer due 1/5/2023; Christopher Ware answer due 1/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/15/22. (cs)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/15 3:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Unopposed) or Otherwise Respond by Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware. (Marsh, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/14 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey J. Hosford on behalf of Michael Guyse All Defendants. (Hosford, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/04 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
4 4 notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Wed 10/19 10:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to City of Columbus, Mississippi, Aaron Andrews, and Christopher Ware (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/18 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/18 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Thomas Marsh on behalf of Aaron Andrews, City of Columbus, Mississippi, Christopher Ware (Marsh, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/19 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2137668, filed by Michael Guyse. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Mon 09/19 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
Related: [-]