Original Case: 3:22-cr-30003

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cr-02969
Typecriminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 12:52 PM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
Jade LaRoche
Represented By
David S. Barari
FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE
contact info
Jade LaRoche
WINNER CITY JAIL
contact info
Amanda Work
FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE
contact info
Jana Miner
FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Troy Robert Morley
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info

GPO Oct 04 2023
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Ralph R. Erickson and Jonathan A. Kobes
AUTHORING JUDGE:James B. Loken (PUBLISHED) [5322668] [22-2969]

Docket last updated: 09/29/2022 12:52 PM CDT
Monday, September 19, 2022
4 pgs CRIMINAL case docketed. [5199771] 22-2969 (ASL)
Related: [-]
21 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Judgment filed 9/6/2022, and docket entries, [5199781] 22-2969 (ASL)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER: The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5199809] 22-2969 (ASL)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 10/11/2022. Transcript due 10/11/2022. Brief of appellant Jade LaRoche due 10/24/2022. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5199815] 22-2969 (ASL)
Related: [-]