Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:22-cv-03050
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2022
Case in other court:Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11373
Last checked: Sunday Mar 19, 2023 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Jessica C. Jeffrey
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Kiddie P.L.C., Inc.
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
Angus Fire
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Jessica C. Jeffrey
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Plaintiff
North Raynham Water District
Represented By
Cary L McDougal
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Jason J Julius
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Luana N Smith
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Christina Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Richard M. Sandman
Rodman Rodman & Sandman
contact info
Brandon J Taylor
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/16 12:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Thursday, May 15, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/15 6:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
22 22 service Summons Issued Wed 10/19 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/07 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J Julius on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Julius, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/03 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Philip)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/03 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Christina)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/03 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Taylor, Brandon)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/03 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Smith, Luana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/30 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Burke Pickrel, Carla)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McDougal, Cary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
13 13 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11373, North Raynham Water District v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3050-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 09/20 1:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:22-cv-11373. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 09/20 1:59 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11373, North Raynham Water District v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3050-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
10 10 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/8/2022. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 103 in MDL Case 2873 received from District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
8 8 STATE COURT Record. (Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
7 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting re3 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Filing to 28 days following the JPML issuing a decision on whether to transfer this action to MDL 2873 by Chemguard and Tyco Fire. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
6 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Magistrate Judge Boal - see doc. 04- assigned in errror - mef). (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
3 3 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Filing by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9469568 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Form