New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:22-cv-08033
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1415 IDEA: Challenge decision re education for handicapped
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2022
Terminated:Feb 09, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 19, 2023 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
52 Chambers Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Marina Moraru
New York City Law Department
contact info
Martin John Bowe, Jr
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
C.L.
on behalf of C.L.G. 56 Henry Street Apt 10
New York, NY 10002
Represented By
Steven J. Alizio
The Law Office Of Steven Alizio, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G.G.
on behalf of C.L.G. 56 Henry Street Apt 10
New York, NY 10002
Represented By
Steven J. Alizio
The Law Office Of Steven Alizio, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
16 16 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/21 3:48 PM
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties, through the undersigned, as follows: I. In consideration of payment of the sum set forth in paragraph "2" below, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), without fees, costs, or expenses in excess of the amount specified in paragraph "2". 2. The City of New York shall pay TWENTY EIGHT THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($28,500.00) in full satisfaction of all claims for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses, incurred or accrued in connection with school year 2020-21, including IH Case No. 200531 and the instant federal action. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/21/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) Tue 02/21 3:49 PM
Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers). Transmitted re:16 Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal to the Finance Unit (Cashiers) for case processing..(jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
15 15 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 02/13 4:58 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Moraru, Marina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 02/09 12:51 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised (Docket No. 13) that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within (30) thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same (30) thirty-day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/8/2023) (kv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
13 13 misc Letter Wed 02/08 11:12 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Marina Moraru dated February 8, 2023 re: Case Status/Settlement. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Moraru, Marina)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/09 12:08 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on consent addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Marina Moraru dated January 5, 2023.,1 Complaint. OK. New York City Department of Education answer due 2/13/2023. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/9/2023) (kv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/05 7:00 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on consent addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Marina Moraru dated January 5, 2023. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Moraru, Marina)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/16 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marina Moraru on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Moraru, Marina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/11 4:41 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Martin Bowe dated 10.7.2022. OK. New York City Department of Education answer due 1/13/2023. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/07 4:37 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Martin Bowe dated 10.7.2022. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/07 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin John Bowe, Jr on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 09/22 5:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by C.L.; G.G...(Alizio, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 09/22 12:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(lal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/21 3:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by C.L., G.G...(Alizio, Steven)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 09/21 2:31 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/21 2:32 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 09/21 2:32 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/21 2:35 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven J. Alizio to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The party information on the TO Section of the PDF is missing. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/20 5:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alizio, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/20 5:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by C.L., G.G...(Alizio, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/20 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26707909)Document filed by C.L., G.G...(Alizio, Steven)
Related: [-]