Town of Millis v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03052 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11377 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 11, 2023 5:01 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kiddie P.L.C., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Millis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hcor, ) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J Julius on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Julius, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Philip) |
|
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Christina) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Smith, Luana) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Burke Pickrel, Carla) |
|
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McDougal, Cary) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
15 | 15 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11377, Town of Millis v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3052-RMG (sshe, ) | |
13 | 13
![]() Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:22-cv-11377. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
12 | 12 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/8/2022. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Assented-to Motion for an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint. The time for all defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to twenty-eight (28) days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") issues its decision on the anticipated motion by Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. (collectively, "Tyco") to seek transfer of this action to MDL No. 2873. Tyco shall file status reports here every thirty days advising the court when the anticipated motion has been filed with the JPML and reporting on further developments through resolution of the anticipated motion. (Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Friday, August 26, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |