Lunenburg Water District v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03053 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 4:22-cv-11369 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 11, 2023 4:48 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kiddie P.L.C., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CHEMGUARD CHEMICALS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Lunenburg Water District
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hcor, ) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J Julius on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Julius, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Philip) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Christina) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Smith, Luana) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Burke Pickrel, Carla) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McDougal, Cary) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts, 4:22-cv-11369, Lunenburg Water District v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3053-RMG (sshe, ) | |
12 | 12
![]() Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 4:22-cv-11369. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/8/2022. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting3 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Filing (Lima, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Friday, August 26, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
5 | 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 8/26/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-11369. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
4 | 4 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Currie, Haley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |