Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-01280
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2022 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR. (1)
Represented By
Sarah E. Levin
Federal Public Defender For Western District Of Pennsylvania
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert C. Schupansky
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 6:16 AM EDT
Monday, September 19, 2022
Duty Magistrate Judge assigned to case. If a sealed mj case was opened, sealed access rights have been granted. (sms)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT (Schupansky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Affidavit
2 2 4 pgs Government's Request for Detention as to THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR (Schupansky, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR., signed by Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 9/19/2022. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit Affidavit for Criminal Complaint, signed by Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 9/19/2022.
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR. (jmb)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2022. (jmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2022. (jmb)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: An Initial Appearance as to THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR. was held on 9/19/2022. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (jmb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs ORDER Scheduling a Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing as to THOMAS A. YOCUM, JR. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. A Preliminary Examination and a Detention Hearing are both scheduled for 9/21/2022 at 2:00 PM via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2022. (jmb)
Related: [-]