Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:22-mc-81473
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 03/18 1:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Darren Joel Spielman (pt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 01/16 2:57 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing case without prejudice and directing Clerk to close case. In light of the Joint Stipulation to Dismiss this action without prejudice13 , this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE , and the Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/16/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
15 15 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 01/03 3:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Darren Joel Spielman (pt)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Fri 01/03 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Email; by Darren Joel Spielman (Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
12 12 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 10/07 11:40 AM
ORDER Memorializing Discovery Rulings: Denying1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 10/07 10:43 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Telephonic Hearing held on 10/7/2022 regarding the Motion to Quash Subpoenas for Deposition and Document Production filed by Prive Porter, LLC and Jeffery Berk (ECF No. 1) Total time in court: 33 minutes. (Digital BER_1_10.7.2022) (kso)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
9 9 respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 10/03 4:16 PM
REPLY to6 Response/Reply (Other),1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, by Jeffrey Berk, PRIVE PORTER, LLC.(Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeff Berk in Support
order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 10/03 5:03 PM
PAPERLESS Order setting Telephonic Hearing for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on the Motion to Quash Subpoenas for Deposition and Document Production filed by Prive Porter, LLC and Jeffery Berk (ECF No. 1). Counsel shall appear telephonically using the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/3/2022. (kso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 09/29 11:19 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Prive Porter, LLC and Jeffery Berk to reply to the response filed by Hermes International and Hermes of Paris, Inc.6 on or before October 3, 2022 at 5:00 pm, Eastern Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/29/2022. (kso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/28 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon Thomas Crossland on behalf of Hermes International, Hermes of Paris, Inc.. Attorney Brandon Thomas Crossland added to party Hermes International(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon Thomas Crossland added to party Hermes of Paris, Inc.(pty:pla). (Crossland, Brandon)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Response/Reply (Other) Wed 09/28 2:52 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, by Hermes International, Hermes of Paris, Inc..(Keown, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Friday, September 23, 2022
order Order Referring Motion Fri 09/23 10:28 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and Local Magistrate Judge Rule 1, it is ORDERED that1 Petitioners' Motion to Quash Subpoena is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/23/2022. (sj00)
Related: [-]
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 09/23 1:40 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Hermes International and Hermes of Paris, Inc. to respond to the Motion to Quash Subpoenas for Deposition and Document Production1 filed by Prive Porter, LLC and Jeffery Berk on or before September 28, 2022. In addition to responding to the motion on the merits, Hermes International and Hermes of Paris, Inc. shall advise the Court regarding: (1) the status of compliance with the subpoenas by Prive Porter, LLC and Jeffrey Berk and (2) whether the Court should sua sponte transfer the motion to the issuing court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/23/2022. (kso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
3 3 misc Bar Letter Thu 09/22 2:14 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Deborah A. Wilcox, Kevin M. Wallace, Lisa Bollinger Gehman, Oren J. Warshavsky, Christopher Jon Sprigman, Rhett Owen Millsaps, II, Mark P. McKenna, Rebecca Tushnet, mailing date September 22, 2022, (pt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
1 1 misccs Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District Wed 09/21 6:04 PM
Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Quash from Another District Re: 1:22-cv-00384-JSR (USDC NYSD) . Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15967605, filed by PRIVE PORTER, LLC, Jeffrey Berk.(Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Prive Porter LLC - subpoena on 09.02.2022,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Subpoena to Prive Porter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Subpoena To Jeffrey Berk,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Dkt 48 Order Scheduling,
Att: 5 Exhibit E Prive Responses to Hermes Subpoena (with docs),
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
order Judge Assignment Thu 09/22 12:53 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon (nan)
Related: [-]