Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00322
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 22, 2022 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
DELANCEY COSOM (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
TIMOTHY M. LANNI
United States Attorney'S Office - Edpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/22/2022 4:15 AM EDT
Monday, September 19, 2022
1 1 4 pgs INFORMATION as to DELANCEY COSOM (1) count(s) 1. (tomg) (tomg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Designation Form
Att: 2 (9/20/2022) INFORMATION SHEET