Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:22-mj-01848
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 22, 2022 2:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Ludivina Martinez-Montes (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Peter I. Brostowin
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/22/2022 2:51 AM CDT
Sunday, September 18, 2022
Arrest of Ludivina Martinez-Montes, filed. (stgarcia, 7)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Ludivina Martinez-Montes held on 9/20/2022. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant agreed to have the hearing by video conference. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Cahal Patrick McColgan, AUSA; Vanessa Mendoza, AFPD. (USPO: Robert Weaver) (ERO: Sandra Ann Silva) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis, used) (DUSM: David Herrera). (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Peter I. Brostowin appearing for USA, filed.(Brostowin, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ludivina Martinez-Montes (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 9/20/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (stgarcia, 7)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Ludivina Martinez-Montes, filed.(stgarcia, 7)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Ludivina Martinez-Montes (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Ludivina Martinez-Montes. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Ludivina Martinez-Montes. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Ludivina Martinez-Montes, filed.
Related: [-]