Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00080
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 22, 2022 3:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael A Puehler (1)
Represented By
Zenaida Renee Lockard
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ebunoluwa A. Taiwo
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2023
JUDGMENT as to Michael A Puehler, Counts 1 and 2. Defendant sentenced to 3 Years Probation on Count 1 and 3 Years Probation on Count 2 to be served concurrently to each other. $200 special assessment ($100 per count). Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/29/23. (sct)

Docket last updated: 09/22/2022 3:57 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
2 2 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Michael A Puehler (1) count(s) 1, 2. (km)
Related: [-]
3 3 PLEA AGREEMENT (WITH STATEMENT OF FACTS) as to Michael A Puehler. (km)
Related: [-]