Rojas v. Human Resources Administration
Original Case: 1:18-cv-06852
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02055 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 04, 2023 5:46 PM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Human Resources Administration
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Carlos Rojas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/04/2023 5:19 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Carlos Rojas, FILED. [3386078] 22-2055 [Entered: 09/21/2022 01:07 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 08/29/2022, RECEIVED.[3386082] 22-2055 [Entered: 09/21/2022 01:10 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3386083] 22-2055 [Entered: 09/21/2022 01:11 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
4 | 4 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3386084] 22-2055 [Entered: 09/21/2022 01:13 PM] |