Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:John F Heil, III
Referred: Susan E Huntsman
Case #: 4:22-cv-00411
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2022
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 6:51 AM CDT
Defendant
AFNI Inc.
Represented By
Cooper Morgan Walker
Frost Echols LLC
contact info
Defendant
LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By
Robert Alan Bragalone
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vu Truong
Represented By
Ge'Andra Denise Johnson
Johnson Legal, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Harmonniey S Kinchion
Law Offices Of Harmonniey S. Kinchion
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, February 08, 2024
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/08 3:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Vu Truong (Johnson, Ge'Andra)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Fri 02/09 11:09 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number38 ) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
37 37 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 10/31 9:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , striking the remaining scheduling order deadlines , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/30 11:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Vu Truong (Johnson, Ge'Andra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
35 35 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Wed 06/07 3:06 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Counsel for LVNV Funding LLC has show cause that sanctions should not be awarded, and no sanctions will be imposed. Related [+] (CDLJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 34 Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,30 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Directing Party to Show Cause,
Thursday, June 01, 2023
34 34 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Thu 06/01 1:15 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little By June 8, 2023, counsel of record for LVNV Funding, LLC shall submit (not file) under seal for in camera review the evidence described in the attached Order , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/8/2023) Related [+] (CDLJ, Judge)
Related: [-] 33 Minutes of Show Cause Hearing, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),30 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Directing Party to Show Cause,
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
33 33 minutes 19 - Show Cause Hearing Held Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 05/31 10:48 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Christine D Little: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/31/2023 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: C2) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
32 32 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 05/30 4:03 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Calvert Richard McMahon on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC [Note: Attorney Calvert Richard McMahon added to party LVNV Funding, LLC(pty:dft).] (McMahon, Calvert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/26 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by LVNV Funding, LLC (Bragalone, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
30 30 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Directing - Party to Show Cause Mon 05/01 2:06 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Show Cause Hearing set for 5/31/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christine D Little), directing Counsel of record for LVNV Funding, LLC to show cause (CDL2, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 04/14 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The parties' counsel have advised that the case has settled. The settlement conference set for April 18, 2023 is therefore stricken. The parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by May 15, 2023 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 5/15/2023) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDLJ, Judge) Modified on 4/14/2023 ENTERED IN ERROR (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Docket Entry Modification Fri 04/14 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Minute Order entered in wrong case; Correction: Minute Order entered in correct case Related [+] (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 28 Minute Order,,, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to Appear Tue 04/04 12:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The Joint Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference is granted. The Settlement Conference set on 4/18/23 at 1:00 p.m. before ASJ Howard Barnett will be held via video conference.The Court will advise counsel via email how to access the video conference and counsel shall convey the access information to their clients. All other guidelines set forth in the Court's original Settlement Conference Order (Dkt. # 20) shall remain in effect. ; granting25 Motion for Leave to Appear Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL2, Chambers)
Related: [-] 25 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference
Monday, April 03, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Refer Motion(s) Mon 04/03 8:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 25 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference
Friday, March 31, 2023
25 25 motion Appear Fri 03/31 5:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference by LVNV Funding, LLC (Bragalone, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
24 24 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Strike/Withdraw Document(s) Thu 03/23 9:43 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Stipulated Dismissal as to Defendant AFNI, Inc. due 3/29/2023. Deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order 19 remian in effect , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2023, Discovery due by 7/10/2023, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III), striking/withdrawing document(s) Related [+] (Documents Terminated:22 Order, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) ) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 22 Order, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s)
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
23 23 misc Errata/Correction to Document Wed 03/22 11:55 PM
ERRATA/CORRECTION Related [+] by Vu Truong (Johnson, Ge'Andra)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Settlement
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
22 22 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 02/22 10:00 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Stipulated Dismissal due 3/22/2023 , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 3/22/2023), striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/21 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Vu Truong (Johnson, Ge'Andra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
20 20 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Mon 02/13 2:54 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Howard G. Barnett, Jr. (at courthouse) ( Settlement Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 01:00 PM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (CDL2, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
19 19 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 02/08 2:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2023, Discovery due by 7/10/2023, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
18 18 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Tue 02/07 3:00 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Vu Truong (Kinchion, Harmonniey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
17 17 order 02 - Minute Order Wed 01/18 11:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III regarding failure to prosecute. (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
16 16 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Tue 12/27 3:39 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/13/2023) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to Waive Tue 12/27 9:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Defendant AFNI Inc.'s Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement is granted ; granting7 Motion to Waive Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
order 02 - Minute Order Tue 12/13 1:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Plaintiff may file a Response to Defendant AFNI Inc.'s Motion for Relief from the Local Counsel Requirement. Any Response shall be filed no later than 12/19/2022. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 12/09 3:56 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC) by LVNV Funding, LLC (Bragalone, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Thu 12/08 9:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing LVNV Funding, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 12/06 7:00 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent LVNV Funding, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC) by LVNV Funding, LLC (Bragalone, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Answer Tue 12/06 6:57 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by LVNV Funding, LLC (Bragalone, Robert)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 12/06 6:52 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Alan Bragalone on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC [Note: Attorney Robert Alan Bragalone added to party LVNV Funding, LLC(pty:dft).] (Bragalone, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
7 7 motion Waive Tue 11/08 1:53 PM
MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof by AFNI Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 11/08 1:44 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AFNI Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Answer Tue 11/08 1:41 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by AFNI Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/08 3:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AFNI Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
4 4 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 11/04 4:19 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cooper Morgan Walker on behalf of AFNI Inc. (Walker, Cooper)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/27 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2681398) by Vu Truong (Johnson, Ge'Andra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/22 3:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Vu Truong (Johnson, Ge'Andra)
Related: [-]