Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:22-cv-03433
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2022
Terminated:Jul 03, 2023
Case in other court:21st Judicial Court, Tangipahoa Parish, 22-0002313
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Represented By
Tara Elizabeth Clement
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Robert I. Siegel
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Occidental Fire & Casualty Insurance Company of North Carolina
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Freddy W. Lee
Represented By
William Lawton Pratt, Sr
Hodge Law Firm
contact info
John Rohlf Jewell
The Hodge Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheron M. Lee
Represented By
William Lawton Pratt, Sr
Hodge Law Firm
contact info
John Rohlf Jewell
The Hodge Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
13 13 21 pgs order Order Tue 12/31 10:09 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 07/03 2:14 PM
ORDER - Considering the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims in the above captioned matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/3/23. (cg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
11 11 motion Dismiss Case Thu 06/29 1:40 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by Freddy W. Lee, Sheron M. Lee, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina.(Clement, Tara) Modified filers on 6/29/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 28, 2022
10 10 27 pgs order Order Fri 10/28 4:13 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Thu 10/20 1:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina.(Clement, Tara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/28 10:47 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, as to Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina. Defendant is granted an additional 21 days to file responsive pleadings to the petition filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on September 27, 2022. (mp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
7 7 25 pgs order Order Mon 09/26 3:41 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/2022.(jls)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/26 10:47 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina.(Clement, Tara) Modified text on 9/26/2022 (jls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Mon 09/26 2:59 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re2 Notice of Compliance,3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, and5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Case caption is incorrect. The case caption of all future filings should remain as pleadings were captioned in state court.** (jls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
4 4 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 09/22 3:13 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina identifying Corporate Parent IAT Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent IAT Reinsurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Harco National Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina for Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina (Clement, Tara)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 09/22 3:11 PM
Notice of Compliance by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina re1 Notice of Removal,,. (Clement, Tara)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/22 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Court, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2022-0002313 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9567426) filed by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina.Attorney Tara Elizabeth Clement added to party Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina(pty:dft).(Clement, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - La SOS Service Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - NC SOS Service Search,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Dec Page,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 09/22 4:32 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
Related: [-]