Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Kenneth G Gale
Case #: 5:22-cv-04049
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2022
Terminated:May 17, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 6:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Kraig Knowlton
Represented By
Carrie A. Barney
Kansas Attorney General - Topeka
contact info
Defendant
Angie Krahe
Represented By
Carrie A. Barney
Kansas Attorney General - Topeka
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Allen
1301 S. Ida St.
Wichita, KS 67211

GPO Sep 23 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/23/22. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by regular mail. (df)
GPO Nov 09 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on November 9, 2022. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by regular mail. (mls)
GPO Feb 10 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 15 MOTION for Reconsideration; denying without prejudice 19 Motion Calling for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/10/2023. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by regular mail. (kmc)
GPO Apr 04 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 24 MOTION FOR SECTION 1983 RELIEF. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/4/2023. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by regular mail. (kas)
GPO May 17 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 46) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion or Relief (Doc. 39) asking for an award of damages is denied. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/17/2023. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by regular mail. (mam)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 07, 2024
57 57 appeal Mandate Thu 03/07 2:53 PM
APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA affirming decision of the District Court (Appeal No. 23-3092 (Attachment: #1 10CCA Mandate Letter)(msb)
Related: [-]