California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:22-cv-06870
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2022
Terminated:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Raya
Mcneil Tropp And Braun LLP
contact info
Deborah S Tropp
Mcneil Tropp And Braun LLP
contact info
Crystal L. Rorabaugh
Mcneil Tropp And Braun LLP
contact info
Defendant
Doe Costco Store Manager
Plaintiff
Marilyn Ventress
Represented By
Iman Mahdavian
Vaziri Law Group Apc
contact info
Mark Joseph Giannamore
Vaziri Law Group Apc
contact info
Siamak Vaziri
Vaziri Law Group Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 11/09/2022


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Friday, December 08, 2023
41 41 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 12/08 8:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CASE DUE TO SETTLEMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court has been advised that this action has been settled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for 60 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action on a showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed and further proceedings are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
40 40 notice Settlement Tue 12/05 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Order to Vacate all Hearings and Deadlines filed by Marilyn Ventress Marilyn Ventress. (Giannamore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
39 39 13 pgs trial Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law Wed 11/29 5:20 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress. (Giannamore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
38 38 11 pgs trial Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law Tue 11/28 4:30 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Rorabaugh, Crystal)
Related: [-]
37 37 trial Witness List Tue 11/28 4:27 PM
Witness List filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Rorabaugh, Crystal)
Related: [-]
36 36 trial Exhibit List Tue 11/28 4:24 PM
JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Rorabaugh, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/14 4:28 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer on Joint Stipulation to Continue The Trial and Related Dates34 . The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 12/11/2023. The Trial is continued to 1/9/2024. See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
34 34 stip Continue Fri 07/14 2:19 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Trial from 9/5/2023 to 1/9/2024 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,,14 filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Tropp, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/10 12:09 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that the Expert Discovery Cutoff is hereby extended from 5/16/2023 to 6/6/202332 . (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
32 32 stip Continue Tue 05/09 3:17 PM
STIPULATION to Continue EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF from 5/16/2023 to 6/6/2023 filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Rorabaugh, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
31 31 order Protective Order Wed 03/15 9:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re Stipulation for Protective Order.30 Good Cause Appearing, the Court hereby approves this Stipulation and Protective Order. (See document for details) (vmun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Protective Order
30 30 stip Protective Order Tue 03/14 4:56 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Tropp, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 13, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/13 10:36 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Continue28 , Expert Discovery cut-off 5/16/2023. See Order for specifics. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
28 28 stip Continue Fri 03/10 4:20 PM
STIPULATION to Continue EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Rorabaugh, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 09, 2023
27 27 order Remand Case to State Court Thu 03/09 5:18 PM
Order DENYING Leave to Amend and to Remand Action (Dkt. 24) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Denying24 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. See document for specifics. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 02/17 9:11 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion21 and24 set for February 27, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
25 25 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 02/16 2:24 PM
TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND Yes re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Los Angeles, Sprint Street Courthouse24 filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Tropp, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, February 10, 2023
24 24 motion Remand Case to State Court Fri 02/10 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Los Angeles, Sprint Street Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Giannamore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Dkt. 24-1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Remand Action to State Court,
Att: 2 Declaration Dkt. 24-2 Declaration of Mark Giannamore, Esq. in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Remand Action to State Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit Dkt. 24-3 Ex. A- Operative Summons and Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Dkt. 24-4 Ex. B - Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit Dkt. 24-5 Ex. C - Defendant's Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit Dkt. 24-6 Ex. D - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Dkt. 24-7 Proposed Order re Motion to Remand
23 23 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/10 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress, identifying Gregory David Carter II. (Giannamore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
22 22 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 02/09 6:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress21 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No notice of interested parties. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Remand Case to State Court Thu 02/09 11:08 AM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Los Angeles, Sprint Street Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Giannamore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Dkt. 21-1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Remand Action to State Court,
Att: 2 Declaration Dkt. 21-2 Declaration of Mark Giannamore, Esq. in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Remand Action to State Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit Dkt. 21-3 Ex. A- Operative Summons and Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Dkt. 21-4 Ex. B - Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit Dkt. 21-5 Ex. C - Defendant's Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit Dkt. 21-6 Ex. D - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Dkt. 21-7 Proposed Order re Motion to Remand
20 20 attorney Change of Address Thu 02/09 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Mark Joseph Giannamore attorney for Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress. Changing attorneys address to 1900 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1700, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress. (Attorney Mark Joseph Giannamore added to party Marilyn Ventress(pty:pla))(Giannamore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 02/03 4:09 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Crystal L. Rorabaugh counsel for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Adding Crystal L. Rorabaugh as counsel of record for Costco Wholesale Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attorney Crystal L. Rorabaugh added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft))(Rorabaugh, Crystal)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 02/03 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Deborah S Tropp counsel for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Lauren E. Raya is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Tropp, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
17 17 attorney Change of Address Mon 12/12 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Deborah S Tropp attorney for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Changing attorneys address to 4695 MacArthur Court, Suite 800, Newport Beach, California 92660. Filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Tropp, Deborah)
Related: [-]
16 16 attorney Change of Address Mon 12/12 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Lauren Elizabeth Raya attorney for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Changing attorneys address to 4695 MacArthur Court, Suite 800, Newport Beach, California 92660. Filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
15 15 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 11/09 10:58 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/13/23. (rfi)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 11/09 10:55 AM
Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/09 10:52 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
12 12 misc Declaration Wed 10/26 1:44 PM
DECLARATION of Lauren E. Raya re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan10 re OSC FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT ORDER filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A-Joint 26F & Scheduling Dates,
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARK J. GIANNAMORE REGARDING OSC FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT ORDER
Monday, October 24, 2022
11 11 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 10/24 7:39 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS. This overburdened court and its staff do not have time to communicate repeatedly with counsel in an effort to have them follow the rules and orders of this Court. Counsel have failed to comply with the Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates in one or more respects. For example, counsel may have (1) failed to file a Joint 26(f) Report at all, (2) failed to provide all of the information required by the Order, (3) failed to attach a Schedule, or (4) failed to complete the Schedule properly. Counsel are ordered to show cause why each side should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500 for their failure to comply with the Order. Counsel whose signature appears on the Joint 26(f) Report must file a declaration stating who was (1) responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, (2) responsible for preparing and reviewing the Report and ensuring its accuracy and compliance with the Order, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The declaration should state the name of that person (only if the person is an attorney) and the position of that person (partner, associate, paralegal, assistant, secretary, etc.). The declaration shall also state why the Report failed to comply with the Order. If no Report was filed, the declaration must state who was (1) responsible for calendaring the date for meeting with counsel and filing the Report, (2) responsible for responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The same information as to name and position must be provided as well as an explanation as to why no Report was filed. In addition, the parties are ordered to review the Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates carefully, and to provide a Report and a Schedule that provides specific dates for all of the relevant items in the Schedule. The dates must comply with the time frames in the Weeks before trial column and the required days of the week: a Monday (not a holiday) for the pretrial conference and last day for hearing motions and a Tuesday (not a holiday) for trial. The declarations, Report, and Schedule are due within five Court days. The filing of compliant declarations, Report, and Schedule will be a sufficient response to this Order to Show Cause. The scheduling conference date is vacated. The parties are urged to conduct themselves in a professional manner and to make every effort to agree on dates. Further failures to comply with the rules and orders of this Court, and the rules and orders of the Central District, will result in sanctions against one or both parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 10/19 2:37 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6-8 days, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation..(Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, September 30, 2022
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 09/30 1:06 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 09/29 4:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/23 8:24 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 09/23 12:14 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 09/23 12:13 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 09/23 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/22 5:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation. (Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 09/22 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation, identifying Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/22 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV26275 Receipt No: ACACDC-34035355 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation. (Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Raya added to party COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington corporation(pty:dft))(Raya, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Lauren E. Raya ISO Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A to D to Declaration of LER In Support of Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 09/23 12:18 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Doe Costco Store Manager, Does 1 to 100, Inclusive, filed by plaintiff Marilyn Ventress. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A-000003) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 09/23 12:21 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marilyn Ventress, upon Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B-000002) (ghap)
Related: [-]