New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:18-cv-01432
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2018
Re-opened:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 08, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 25, 2022 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant
EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.
Represented By
DAVID FOSTER HERMAN
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
DANIELLA GORDON
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
COURTNEY JANAE PETERSON
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Mediator
PROFESSOR KAREN TOKARZ
Represented By
KAREN TOKARZ
Washington University School Of Law
contact info
Notice Only
PHV TRAVIS R. KEARBEY
Notice Only
nefmedtre
Plaintiff
HONG ZHUANG
57 VONES LANE
RARITAN, NJ 08869
Represented By
JONATHAN I. NIRENBERG
Rabner Baumgart Ben-Asher & Nirenberg, P.C.
contact info
BRIAN F. CURLEY
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 18, 2024
236 236 appeal USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Thu 04/18 11:41 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to233 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by HONG ZHUANG (Finance notified)(ca3jk, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opinion,
Att: 2 Clerk's letter to District Court
appeal Mandate Notice Thu 04/18 2:07 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 4/18/2024. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (js)
Related: [-]