New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:22-cv-08167
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2022
Terminated:Apr 19, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 22, 2023 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
6535 Broadway Owners Corp.
Represented By
Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Stephen Paul Pischl
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Maistre
Represented By
Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Stephen Paul Pischl
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Veritas Property Management L.L.C.
Represented By
Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Stephen Paul Pischl
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Louis Paulino
Represented By
Michael Taubenfeld
Fisher Taubenfeld LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 04/19 12:45 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT: Accordingly, the Court approves the settlement subject to the condition addressed above. The Court dismisses the case with prejudice. All pending motions are moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/19/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stay Lifted Wed 04/19 12:42 PM
Case Stay Lifted. (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
17 17 misc Letter Tue 04/18 8:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Michael Taubenfeld dated April 18, 2023 re: Settlement Approval. Document filed by Louis Paulino..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Attorney Timesheets
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 04/04 10:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cheeks Approval Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Michael Taubenfeld dated April 4, 2023. Document filed by Louis Paulino..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/04 10:28 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Cheeks Approval Motion: The deadline is hereby extended to April 18, 2023. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 03/17 12:42 PM
ORDER, No later than April 6, 2023, the parties shall file a motion for class certification, preliminary approval of the class-wide settlement, and approval of the FLSA settlement. The motion papers shall include a copy of the parties proposed settlement as well as a proposed schedule for notice to the class members, for class members to opt-out, for preliminary approval of the settlement, and for a fairness hearing, as well as a proposal for the manner in which class members will be notified. See generally Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e). The parties shall also submit as a separate entry on the docket and as a Word document submitted by email to Chambers at Furman_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov a proposed order preliminarily approving the class-wide settlement, providing for notice, and scheduling a settlement fairness hearing. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 4/6/2023.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/17/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 03/16 4:31 PM
STATUS REPORT. Parties Participated in Mediation and Have Reached an Agreement in Principle to Resolve All Claims. Document filed by 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., James Maistre, Veritas Property Management L.L.C...(Pischl, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 11/21 11:47 AM
ORDER: granting11 Letter Motion to Stay re:11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay All Further Proceedings in This Matter Through March 15, 2023, Pending Mandatory Mediation. addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Stephen P. Pischl dated November 18, 2022. Application GRANTED. The parties are directed to submit a joint status update on March 16, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/21/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Mon 11/21 11:47 AM
Case Stayed (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
11 11 motion Stay Fri 11/18 3:43 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay All Further Proceedings in This Matter Through March 15, 2023, Pending Mandatory Mediation addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Stephen P. Pischl dated November 18, 2022. Document filed by 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., James Maistre, Veritas Property Management L.L.C...(Pischl, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 10/14 12:02 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/14/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 10/14 12:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: 6535 Broadway Owners Corp. answer due 11/21/2022; James Maistre answer due 11/21/2022; Veritas Property Management L.L.C. answer due 11/21/2022. (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 10/13 7:17 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion, answer, or other response addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ian-Paul A. Poulos dated October 13, 2022. Document filed by 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., James Maistre, Veritas Property Management L.L.C...(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/13 7:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos on behalf of 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., James Maistre, Veritas Property Management L.L.C...(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/28 5:00 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Figueredo no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 5, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/28/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 09/28 4:57 PM
ORDER REGARDING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA"), 29 U.S.C. § 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from an early settlement conference. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, no later than one week after an answer is filed, the parties shall contact the Chambers of the assigned Magistrate Judge to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled below. Further, to facilitate those settlement discussions, the parties shall, no later than three weeks after an answer is filed, exchange limited discovery in aid of settlement; the parties shall confer with respect to the scope of such limited discovery, and promptly raise any disputes with the assigned Magistrate Judge in accordance with his or her Individual Rules and Practices. Separate and apart from the foregoing, unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 5, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. As further set forth by this Order. Initial Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/28/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/28 12:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 6535 Broadway Owners Corp. served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022; James Maistre served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022; Veritas Property Management L.L.C. served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. Service was accepted by Edith S.. Document filed by Louis Paulino..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 09/26 12:48 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., James Maistre, Veritas Property Management L.L.C...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 09/26 12:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 09/26 12:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Louis Paulino. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 09/26 12:45 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 09/26 12:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 09/26 12:46 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/23 4:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/23 4:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Veritas Property Management L.L.C., 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., and James Maistre, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louis Paulino..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/23 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against 6535 Broadway Owners Corp., James Maistre, Veritas Property Management L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26727086)Document filed by Louis Paulino..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Paulino Consent to Sue under FLSA