California Central District Court
Case #: 5:22-mj-00602
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2022
Terminated:Sep 21, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 25, 2022 12:23 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cameron Shepherd (1)
Terminated: 09/21/2022
Represented By
Charles Eaton
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2022 12:38 AM PDT
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
Notice to Northern District of Ohio of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant Cameron Shepherd. Your case number is: 5:22CR265. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:3 Initial Appearance - Arrest on Out of District Warrant - Rule 5(c)(3) (fka Rule 40),,. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Cameron Shepherd, originating in the Northern District of Ohio. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:371,922(a)(6),924(a)(2) and 2. Signed by agent George Poor, ATF, Special Agent. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Cameron Shepherd; defendants Year of Birth: 1989; date of arrest: 9/20/2022 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Cameron Shepherd. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Charles Eaton for Cameron Shepherd, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders bail set as: Cameron Shepherd (1) $10,000 Appearance Bond, see attached for terms and conditions. Court orders defendant held to answer to Northern District of Ohio. Bond to Transfer. Defendant ordered to report on 10/20/22. (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Cameron Shepherd. (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Cameron Shepherd. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Cameron Shepherd. (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Cameron Shepherd, declaring that I have never been issued any passport or other travel document by any country. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Cameron Shepherd. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED Defendant Cameron Shepherd arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Northern District of Ohio at Cleveland.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents