California Central District Court
Case #: 5:22-mj-00542
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2022
Terminated:Sep 08, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 25, 2022 12:29 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David Anthony Myrie (1)
Terminated: 09/08/2022
Represented By
Young J. Kim
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2022 12:35 AM PDT
Friday, August 26, 2022
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant David Anthony Myrie, originating in the District of New Jersey. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3583. Signed by agent D Gibson, USMS, CI DUSM. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant David Anthony Myrie; defendants Year of Birth: 1976; date of arrest: 8/26/2022 USMS# REG 57657-066 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant David Anthony Myrie (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED Defendant David Anthony Myrie arrested on warrant issued by the USDC District of New Jersey at Newark.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signed Application
5 5 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato as to Defendant David Anthony Myrie. Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Young J. Kim for David Anthony Myrie, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 9/1/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Court Smart: 8/26/22. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant David Anthony Myrie. (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant David Anthony Myrie. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant David Anthony Myrie. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato as to Defendant David Anthony Myrie. (mhe)
Related: [-]