Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-50037
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2022 2:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph Garza (1)
Represented By
Paul Edmund Gaziano
Federal Defender Program
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MARS
U.S. Marshal
contact info
PTS
Pretrial Services
contact info
AUSA - Rockford
United States Attorney'S Office (rockford)
contact info
PRO
Probation Office
contact info
Robert Stansell Ladd
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2022
PROTECTIVE Order as to Joseph Garza. Signed by the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 09/26/2022. Mailed notice. (jxk)

Docket last updated: 09/26/2022 2:21 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
1 1 SEALED Document. (jp, )
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Joseph Garza (1) count(s) 1-3. (jp, )
Related: [-]
4 4 DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category IV). (jp, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Joseph Garza : The Grand Jury for the April 2021 Session, a quorum being present, returns the above-entitled indictment in open Court this date before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Arrest warrant to issue. Signed by the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/28/2022. (jp, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ARREST WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to Joseph Garza. (jp, )
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION by USA to Seal the Indictment as to Joseph Garza. (jp, )
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Joseph Garza Signed by the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/28/2022. (jp, )
Related: [-]