Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Case #: 1:22-cv-01505
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 26, 2023 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Glenny
Defendant
Shannon Hilliard
Defendant
Kevin McDonald
Plaintiff
Richard T. Truett, Jr.
KV-4393 SCI - HUNTINGDON SPECIAL MAIL - OPEN ONLY IN THE PRESENCE OF THE INMATE 1100 Pike St
Huntingdon, PA 16654


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Friday, March 10, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 03/10 8:14 AM
ORDER adopting13 Report and Recommendations. ACCORDINGLY, on this 10th day of March 2023, upon independent review of the record and the applicable law, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Saporitos February 15, 2023 Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 13); 2. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs right to commence another action asserting the same claims in a properly signed complaint; and 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/10/23. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
13 13 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 02/15 2:50 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Richard T. Truett, Jr.It is recommended that:1.This action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to file a properly signed complaint, as required by Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and2.The clerk be directed to mark this case as CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2023 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/15/23. (ms)
Related: [-]
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/15 12:44 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/05 11:57 AM
ORDER re1 Complaint filed by Richard T. Truett, Jr.,10 Order - (1) Complaint STRICKEN; (2) Plaintiff shall file amended complaint within 30 days after entry of this order (3) Failure to timely file properly signed amended complaint will result in dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/5/23. (ms)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/05 11:54 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service held in abeyance pending screening. Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/5/23 (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/18 2:59 PM
ORDER - plaintiff shall file his corrected complaint 30 days after entry of this Order, which shall fully comply with the requirements of Rule 11, Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/18/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
9 9 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 10/14 11:42 AM
(CERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard T. Truett, Jr. (ep)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/14 11:42 AM
(CERTIFIED) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard T. Truett, Jr.(ep)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order - 30 Day Administrative Order Mon 10/03 10:29 AM
THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/03/2022.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP (civil rights)
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
6 6 order Standing Practice Order (Use Only in Non-Prisoner Pro Se Cases) Tue 09/27 1:50 PM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (ep)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Tue 09/27 1:49 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ep)
Related: [-]
4 4 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Tue 09/27 1:44 PM
AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 09/27 1:43 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard T. Truett, Jr. (ep)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/27 1:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard T. Truett, Jr.(ep)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert Glenny, Shannon Hilliard, Kevin McDonald lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Richard T. Truett, Jr.(ep)
Related: [-]