New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:22-cv-05742
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 20, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 26, 2023 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
PNC BNK
300 FIFTH AVENUE
PITTSBURGH, PA 15222
Represented By
WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIE SASHA WALEK
8917 RIVER ROAD UNIT 3
NORTH BERGEN, NJ 07047
Represented By
THOMAS GERARD MASCIOCCHI
Keaveney Legal Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES
Terminated: 12/29/2022
12 LIBERTY STREET
BLOOMFIELD, NJ 07003
Represented By
MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Wilson Elser
contact info
Defendant
LUCIEN HODELIN
Terminated: 12/29/2022
12 LIBERTY STREET
BLOOMFIELD, NJ 07003
Represented By
MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Wilson Elser
contact info


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Thursday, April 20, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/20 10:08 AM
STIPULATED CONSENT ORDER terminating as moot12 PNC Bank's Motion to Dismiss; directing the Clerk of the Court to CLOSE this matter. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/20/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/20 10:10 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to33 Stipulated Consent Order (dam)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 04/20 11:04 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2023. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 04/19 4:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 04/19 4:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
30 30 order Order Mon 04/10 12:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' recent correspondence. (ECF No. 28-29). The 4/20/23 status conference will proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/10/23. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
29 29 misc Letter Fri 04/07 3:04 PM
Letter from Defendant, PNC Bank, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
28 28 misc Letter Thu 04/06 5:05 PM
Letter. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/19 12:08 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/19/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
26 26 order Order Fri 01/13 1:11 PM
TEXT ORDER: By 1/17/23, the parties shall submit a scheduling order in the format provided in the undersigneds Judicial Preferences for Judge Salas cases. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/13/23. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
25 25 misc Letter Thu 01/12 9:33 AM
Letter. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
24 24 order Order Wed 01/11 12:16 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit the proper scheduling order on the docket as requested in DE 13 by 1/17/23. The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 4/20/23 at 10:30am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/11/23. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 01/11 12:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2023. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
23 23 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 01/09 3:02 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PNC BNK re12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 29, 2022
22 22 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 12/29 3:43 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER of Partial Dismissal as to Defendants E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES and LUCIEN HODELIN only. Defendants E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES and LUCIEN HODELIN terminated. E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES and LUCIEN HODELIN's14 Motion to Dismiss is hereby terminated as moot. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/29/2022. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 12/28 5:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to E&L Appraisal Services and Lucien Hodelin only by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order Wed 12/28 9:48 AM
LETTER ORDER granting19 Defendant PNC Bank, N.A.'s request for an extension of its deadline to file a reply brief through 1/9/2023. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/28/2022. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
19 19 misc Letter Tue 12/27 11:07 AM
Letter from counsel for PNC Bank, N.A. requesting extension to 1/9/23 to file reply brief re18 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
18 18 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/23 12:18 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint AS FILED BY DEFENDANT PNC(MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EX 1 - COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX 2 - CASE LAW
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/13 9:52 AM
LETTER ORDER granting16 Defendant's Request for a one-week extension of the deadline to file a Reply Brief to 1/3/2023 regarding the12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/13/2022. (dam)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Mon 12/12 2:22 PM
Letter from Defendant, PNC Bank, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Mon 12/05 10:14 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the15 Letter Rule 7.1 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference please use the event "Letter Rule 7.1" that can be found under CIVIL - OTHER FILINGS - OTHER DOCUMENTS. The Clerks office has terminated the motion, reviewed the request and reset the motion according to Local Rule 7.1 (d)(5). This message is for informational purposes only and this submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/02 7:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/30 10:51 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion set for 1/3/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
14 14 motion Dismiss Tue 11/29 8:18 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN.(BILLEK, MAXWELL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits A-C,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Brief
Monday, November 21, 2022
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 11/21 10:27 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
13 13 order Order Thu 11/17 9:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 1/11/23 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/16/22. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 11/17 9:43 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/17 11:36 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 12/19/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 11/16 4:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by PNC BNK.(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification of Counsel with Exhibits,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
11 11 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 11/01 11:56 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to E&L Appraisal Services and Lucien Hodelin. Attorney MAXWELL L. BILLEK for E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES,MAXWELL L. BILLEK for LUCIEN HODELIN added. (BILLEK, MAXWELL)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/01 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MAXWELL L. BILLEK on behalf of E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN (BILLEK, MAXWELL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 11/01 12:09 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2022. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
9 9 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 10/31 11:59 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to PNC Bank, N.A...(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Mon 10/31 11:54 AM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by PNC BNK.(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 10/31 11:50 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC BNK. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/31 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY on behalf of PNC BNK(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 10/31 4:03 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PNC BNK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/17/2022. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/24 3:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on E&L Appraisal Services on 10/11/2022, filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/24 3:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Lucien Hodelin on 10/11/2022, filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/24 3:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on PNC on 10.13.22, filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/05 2:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN, PNC BNK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/28 11:45 AM
Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN, PNC BNK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13716832), filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK.(Filing Received via E-Mail)(dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons as to PNC,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons as to Lucien,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons as to E&L,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet