Jackson v. Welborn et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Referred: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-05711 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MANDATE OF USCA 23-35412 as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bryce Anthony Jackson,22 Order of USCA. The judgment of this Court, entered March 04, 2024, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. DISMISSED . **DO NOT PRINT** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (RE) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER OF USCA 23-35412 as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bryce Anthony Jackson. The district court certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and revoked appellant's in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a). On July 10, 2023 the court ordered appellant to explain in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed as frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) (court shall dismiss case at any time, if court determines it is frivolous or malicious). Upon a review of the record and response to the court's July 10, 2023 order, we conclude this appeal is frivolous. We therefore deny appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. 9) and dismiss this appeal as frivolous, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. DISMISSED . **DO NOT PRINT** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (RE) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER re 23-35412 20 Referral Notice from Ninth Circuit: The Court certifies in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that Plaintiff's appeal in this case is frivolous and taken in bad faith. The Court accordingly REVOKES Plaintiffs in forma pauperis status for purposes of the appeal, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc USCA/plaintiff) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (RE) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() REFERRAL NOTICE FROM 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS 23-35412 re18 Notice of Appeal. This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); see also Hooker v. American Airlines, 302 F.3d 1091, 1092 (9th Cir. 2002) . If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). This referral shall not affect the briefing schedule previously established by this court. **DO NOT PRINT** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (RE) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 23-35412 as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bryce Anthony Jackson. **DO NOT PRINT** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (RE) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re17 Order by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson. IFP granted on 9/28/2022. (cc: USCA) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (RE) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER DENYING MOTIONS13 14 15 16 TO AMEND by Judge Richard A. Jones. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (CR) |
|
order
~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 06/13 8:53 AM
Motions terminated per Order17 by Judge Richard A. Jones. (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (CR) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO AMEND JUDGEMENT filed by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson. Noting Date 6/23/2023, **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (CR) |
|
Saturday, May 13, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Amend, filed by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson. Noting Date 6/2/2023, **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (CR) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Amend, filed by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson. Noting Date 5/26/2023, **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (CR) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Amend, filed by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson. Noted by Clerk for 5/19/2023. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (LH) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER ADOPTING IN PART re6 Report and Recommendations. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation in part as to the dismissal of the complaint and MODIFIED to include the reasoning set forth herein. by Judge Richard A. Jones. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (CR) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (JWC) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (MJV) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS to6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (JWC) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() OBJECTIONS to6 Report and Recommendations, filed by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson. Noting Date 10/21/2022. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MEMORANDUM of Law, by Plaintiff Bryce Anthony Jackson **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re5 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2022; Noting Date 10/14/2022. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Bryce Anthony Jackson against defendant(s) Bryan Edmiston, Robert Hanks, Brock Hood, Mindy Rothenberger, Stephen Welborn with JURY DEMAND. **DO NOT PRINT** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ORDER GRANTING1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Bryce Anthony Jackson. **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Bryce Jackson, Prisoner ID: 878864) (ST) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |