California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00342
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Terminated:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 12:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Gina Suzanne Lonestar (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Noah Stern
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2022
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Gina Suzanne Lonestar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/26/22. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)

Docket last updated: 09/05/2024 11:24 AM PDT
Thursday, September 08, 2022
1 1 8 pgs INDICTMENT as to Gina Suzanne Lonestar (1) count(s) 1-6. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs Motion to Seal Indictment and Order as to Gina Suzanne Lonestar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/08/22. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]