Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:22-cv-81506
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Case in other court:15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach, Co Fl, 502022CA008312XXXXMB
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 29, 2023 5:13 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
POSaBIT, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan B. Engel
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Deanna Kendall Shullman
Shullman Fugate PLLC
contact info
Monder Khoury
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
IPN, LLC
Represented By
Michael D. Douglas
Global Legal Law Firm
contact info
Bryce Van De Moere
Global Legal Law Firm
contact info
Christopher R. Dryden
Global Legal Law Firm
contact info
Stephen Joseph Kolski, Jr.
Stephen J. Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Attitude Wellness, LLC
a Michigan limited liability company 769 Chicago Road Floor 2
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Jesse H. Diner
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Zainab S. Hazimi
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
contact info
Michael Edward Dutko, Jr.
Buchanan Ingersoll &rooney PC
contact info
Lawrence J. Murphy
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
contact info
Defendant
Green Sunrise Products, LLC
a Michigan limited liability company 769 Chicago Road Suite 200
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Jesse H. Diner
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Zainab S. Hazimi
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
contact info
Michael Edward Dutko, Jr.
Buchanan Ingersoll &rooney PC
contact info
Lawrence J. Murphy
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Sterling
Represented By
Michael Edward Dutko, Jr.
Buchanan Ingersoll &rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
POSaBIT, Inc.
a Washington corporation 11915 124 Avenue NE
Kirkland, WA 98034
Represented By
Jonathan B. Engel
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Deanna Kendall Shullman
Shullman Fugate PLLC
contact info
Monder Khoury
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Saba Shamon
Represented By
Michael Edward Dutko, Jr.
Buchanan Ingersoll &rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
Seth Houk
Represented By
Michael Edward Dutko, Jr.
Buchanan Ingersoll &rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1 - 10
Defendant
Doublebeam, Inc.
300 Deschutes Way Ste 208
Tumwater, WA 98501
Plaintiff
IPN, LLC
a Florida limited liability company 120 S. Dixie Highway Unit 201
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Michael D. Douglas
Global Legal Law Firm
contact info
Bryce Van De Moere
Global Legal Law Firm
contact info
Tyler Guy Finello
Stephen J Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Christopher R. Dryden
Global Legal Law Firm
contact info
Stephen Joseph Kolski, Jr.
Stephen J. Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
137 137 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 10/11 3:15 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE re136 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Attitude Wellness, LLC, Green Sunrise Products, LLC, Jamie Sterling, Saba Shamon, Seth Houk. The above-styled action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]