Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-18873
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday Mar 27, 2023 6:56 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
SHUNELL MCCRAY
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
5 5 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 9:45 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/30 2:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/28 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum-Missouri Eastern by SHUNELL MCCRAY (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/28 10:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7469007.), filed by SHUNELL MCCRAY. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]