Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:21-bk-32351

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:22-ap-03292
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rotating Machinery Services, Inc.
2760 Baglyos Circle
Bethlehem, PA 18020
Represented By
Rotating Machinery Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
David M. Dunn, as Liquidating Trustee of the LBR Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Thursday, October 26, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Thu 10/26 12:30 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/19 4:23 PM
Voluntary Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:22-ap-3292 Closed. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Tue 10/17 3:15 PM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/24 10:17 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by David M. Dunn(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
13 13 notice Notice Wed 03/15 11:49 AM
Notice of Settlement . Filed by David M. Dunn (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/23 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Adversary Order Setting Conference
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
11 11 notice Notice Wed 02/22 1:45 PM
Notice of Order Setting Scheduling Conference . Related [+] Filed by David M. Dunn (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 10 Adversary Order Setting Conference
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
10 10 order Adversary Order Setting Conference Tue 02/21 3:43 PM
Second Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference reset for 3/21/2023 at 02:30 PM by telephone and video conference. (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Adversary Order Setting Conference
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/25 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Adversary Order Setting Conference
8 8 notice Notice Wed 01/25 2:42 PM
Notice of Order Setting Scheduling Conference . Related [+] Filed by David M. Dunn (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 7 Adversary Order Setting Conference
Monday, January 23, 2023
7 7 order Adversary Order Setting Conference Mon 01/23 4:45 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 10:15 AM (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/04 10:18 AM
Summons Service Executed on Rotating Machinery Services, Inc. 10/4/2022. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
5 5 court Summons Issued Mon 10/03 11:44 AM
Summons Issued on Rotating Machinery Services, Inc. Date Issued 10/3/2022. (AntonioBanda)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 09/30 8:51 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Rotating Machinery Services, Inc.. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Thu 09/29 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 09/28 10:12 AM
Adversary case 22-03292 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by David M. Dunn against Rotating Machinery Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A