Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-12066

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:22-ap-01182
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Myron Hale
3010 Wilshire Blvd. Unit 553
Los Angeles, CA 90010
Represented By
Myron Hale
contact info
Plaintiff
Toan B. Chung
Roquemore, Pringle & Moore, Inc. 6055 E. Washington Blvd., Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA 90040
Represented By
Toan B Chung
Roquemore Pringle & Moore
contact info
John P Pringle
Roquemore Pringle & Moore Inc
contact info
Trustee
David M Goodrich (TR)
Golden Goodrich LLP 650 Town Center Drive, Suite 600
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, December 05, 2022
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/05 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-1182 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (ME2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
18 18 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 11/16 9:26 AM
Hearing Held on 11-15-22 re1 Status Conference re Notice of Removal: RULING - Court entered order dismissing action with prejudice. OFF CALENDAR. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED; (ME2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
17 17 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Mon 10/31 1:00 PM
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Request for a Certified Copy Mon 10/31 11:11 AM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. The document will be sent via email to :bankpara@rpmlaw.com: Filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung Related [+]. (Pringle, John)
Related: [-] 14 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 10/31 11:15 AM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:22-ap-01182-BB] ) [misc,paycert] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54815714. Fee amount 11.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 16
Sunday, October 30, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 10/30 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 28, 2022
14 14 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/28 11:45 AM
Order Dismissing Debtors Complaint Against Trustees Counsel With Prejudice (BNC-PDF) Debtors Complaint filed against Trustees Counsel in the Superior Court of Los Angeles County is dismissed with prejudice; and it is hereby FURTHER ORDERED that Adv. No. 2:22-ap-01182-BB is dismissed with prejudice; and it is hereby FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference pending before this Bankruptcy Court on November 15, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed on 10/28/2022 Related [+]. (ME2)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung,5 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
Thursday, October 27, 2022
13 13 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10/27 11:11 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Re: Dismissing Debtor's Complaint Against Trustee's Counsel with Prejudice, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung Related [+]. (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Order Dismissing Debtor's Complaint Against Trustee's Counsel with Prejudice, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
Monday, October 24, 2022
12 12 answer Objection Tue 10/25 1:12 PM
Debtor's Declaration to Objection to Defendant's Notice of Motion for Order Dismissing Debtor's Complaint against Trustee's Counsel with Prejudice; Related [+] Filed by Defendant Myron Hale (ME2)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Order Dismissing Debtor's Complaint Against Trustee's Counsel with Prejudice, with Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
Sunday, October 09, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 10/09 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 07, 2022
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/07 1:06 PM
Order Denying Debtor's Postponement Request Of Hearing Scheduled For October 25, 2022 (BNC-PDF) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Ex Parte Application is DENIED Related [+] Signed on 10/7/2022 (ME2) Modified on 10/7/2022 (ME2)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
9 9 motion Continue Hearing/Rescheduled Hearing (BK/AP Case) (motion) Thu 10/06 3:24 PM
Debtor's Postponement Request of Hearing Scheduled for October 25, 2022 Related [+] Filed by Defendant Myron Hale (ME2)
Related: [-] 5 Generic Motion
Thursday, September 29, 2022
8 8 notice Notice Thu 09/29 3:07 PM
Notice of Status Conference Re Removal of Action, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung Related [+]. (Pringle, John)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:22-ap-01182. Notice of Removal of State Court Action to Federal Bankruptcy Court [Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. 22STCV27838], with Proof of Service by Toan B. Chung. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
7 7 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Thu 09/29 6:55 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 10/25/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (LL)
Related: [-] 5 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 09/28 3:18 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Chung, Toan. (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Wed 09/28 3:09 PM
Motion for Order Dismissing Debtor's Complaint Against Trustee's Counsel with Prejudice, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung (Pringle, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 09/28 2:40 PM
Notice of lodgment of State Court Pleadings, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung Related [+]. (Pringle, John)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:22-ap-01182. Notice of Removal of State Court Action to Federal Bankruptcy Court [Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. 22STCV27838], with Proof of Service by Toan B. Chung. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Wed 09/28 2:25 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/15/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (LL)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Toan B. Chung
2 2 notice Notice Wed 09/28 2:24 PM
Notice of Status Conference re: REMOVAL Of ACTION: The Hearing date is set for 11/15/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012 Filed by . (LL) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2022 (LL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 09/27 2:55 PM
Adversary case 2:22-ap-01182. Notice of Removal of State Court Action to Federal Bankruptcy Court [Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. 22STCV27838], with Proof of Service by Toan B. Chung. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Pringle, John)
Related: [-]