Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-18911
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday Mar 27, 2023 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
GEORGE MCKINLEY HOWARD
Represented By
KATHARINE GALE KROTTINGER
Monsour Law Firm - Longview Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 16, 2022
5 5 service Certificate of Service Fri 12/16 8:39 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEORGE MCKINLEY HOWARD re4 Notice (Other) (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 12/15 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of First Amended Short Form Complaint by GEORGE MCKINLEY HOWARD re3 Amended Complaint (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 11, 2022
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 12/11 10:06 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, filed by GEORGE MCKINLEY HOWARD. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/28 2:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7470736.), filed by GEORGE MCKINLEY HOWARD. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]