Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 0:22-cv-61830
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Lawrence Eliot Blacke
Represented By
Cody Jordan Shilling
Black Law, P.A.
contact info
Roberto Manuel Ureta
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Christopher Walden Lee
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman , Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.
Represented By
Cody Jordan Shilling
Black Law, P.A.
contact info
Roberto Manuel Ureta
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Christopher Walden Lee
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman , Dicker LLP
contact info
Mediator
Frederick Hazouri
Matrix Mediation 1655 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Suite 700 and Suite 710
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Plaintiff
Peter Dimitropoulos
Represented By
J Chris Bristow
Critton, Luttier & Coleman, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 09, 2023
23 23 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 02/09 4:43 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re20 Order to Show Cause by Peter Dimitropoulos. (Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
22 22 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 02/08 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 2/27/2023 at 9:00 a.m... (Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 02/08 9:41 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. PARTIES Selected/Added Frederick Hazouri as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/27/2023 at 9:00 a.m... (Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/01 3:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: re17 Order Referring Case to Mediation. Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 01/03 9:51 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/27 9:44 AM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 12/18/2023 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 12/12/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 1/20/2023., Discovery due by 5/31/2023., Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 1/20/2023., Mediation Deadline 6/30/2023., In Limine Motions due by 11/10/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2023., Motions due by 11/10/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/10/2023.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 12/27 9:35 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/30/2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
16 16 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/29 5:40 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A. (Ureta, Roberto)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/29 4:06 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed J. Chris Bristow by Peter Dimitropoulos (Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
14 14 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 11/23 12:03 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Peter Dimitropoulos (Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/15 6:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.. (Ureta, Roberto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/09 3:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages MOTION for More Definite Statement Response In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ DE 11] filed by Peter Dimitropoulos. Replies due by 11/16/2022. (Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Strike More Definite Statement Wed 10/26 3:54 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages ( Responses due by 11/9/2022), MOTION for More Definite Statement ( Responses due by 11/9/2022) by Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A..(Ureta, Roberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Warranty Deed - 03.17.2011,
Att: 2 Exhibit Warranty Deed - 12.30.2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel Wed 10/26 11:49 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney added Christopher Walden Lee for Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Christopher Walden Lee for Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.. Attorney Roberto M. Ureta added. Attorney Cody Jordan Shilling representing Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A. (Defendant) and Blacke, Lawrence Eliot (Defendant) terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
9 9 motion Substitution of Counsel Mon 10/24 6:08 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Roberto M. Ureta and Christopher W. Lee for Cody Jordan Shilling by Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.. Responses due by 11/7/2022(Ureta, Roberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Counsel for Defendants
8 8 notice Notice of Striking Mon 10/24 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Striking5 Stipulation filed by Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A., Lawrence Eliot Blacke by Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A. (Ureta, Roberto)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 10/24 2:37 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/28/2022 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 10/24 1:16 PM
STIPULATION For Substitution of Counsel by Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A. (Ureta, Roberto)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 10/24 4:00 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re5 Stipulation. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (jas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/07 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cody Jordan Shilling on behalf of Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.. Attorney Cody Jordan Shilling added to party Lawrence Eliot Blacke(pty:dft), Attorney Cody Jordan Shilling added to party Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.(pty:dft). (Shilling, Cody)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/30 5:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Lawrence Eliot Blacke, Law Offices of Lawrence E. Blacke, P.A.. (jc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against LAWRENCE ELIOT BLACKE, LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE E. BLACKE, P.A.,. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15985210, filed by PETER DIMITROPOULOS.(Bristow, J Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Lawrence E. Blacke,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Law office of Lawrence Blacke
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 09/30 4:48 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
Related: [-]