Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-19013
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Feb 16, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 31, 2023 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER WILLIS
Represented By
NICOLE CORINNE BERG
Keller Postman Llc - Chicago Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 16, 2023
5 5 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/16 3:53 PM
ORDER - The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/16/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
4 4 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 10:18 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 09/29 7:41 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - MINNESOTA by CHRISTOPHER WILLIS (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/29 7:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 7:39 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7477206.), filed by CHRISTOPHER WILLIS. (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]