Williams v. USA et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00942 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 29, 2023 5:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 03/08 3:51 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 15 , granted. Discovery deadline extended to 10 April 2024. Dispositive motions and joint status report due by 10 June 2024. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/8/2024. (slb) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 03/08 2:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , File Dispositive Motions, and Submit a Joint Status Report by USA (Granger, Brady) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 01/09 12:57 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint status report, Doc. 13 , appreciated. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/2024. (slb) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Mon 01/08 3:23 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Roger Williams. (Strange, Sammie) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 12/18 2:39 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 11 , granted. Joint status report due by 8 January 2024. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2023. (slb) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 12/18 1:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Roger Williams (Strange, Sammie) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/07 11:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Internal Revenue Service, USA (Granger, Brady) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/29 9:56 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/10/2025 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 3/11/2024. Motions due by 5/10/2024. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/9/2025. Signed at the direction of the Court on 3/29/2023. (slb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 03/29 9:52 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The parties' 26(f) report, Doc. 7 , is noted. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. The parties must follow the procedures outlined in the Final Scheduling Order to resolve discovery disputes. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/29/2023. (slb) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 03/24 2:22 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Roger Williams. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Strange, Sam) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Thu 02/09 5:11 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/27/2023. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2025 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 2/9/2023. (slb) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/03 2:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Internal Revenue Service, USA.(Granger, Brady) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 12/02 1:44 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 2 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 3 February 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/2/2022. (slb) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/01 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brady Wes Granger on behalf of All Defendants (Granger, Brady) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 12/01 10:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by All Defendants (Granger, Brady) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 10/03 4:02 PM
Summons Reissued as to Internal Revenue Service and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) |
||
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/29 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Roger Williams against Internal Revenue Service and USA. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT088465.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (ldb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 09/29 3:52 PM
Summons reissued as to All Defendants and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) |