Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth W Hanes
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 2:22-cv-00404
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) - Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Jan 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 29, 2023 6:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Stacy Bennis
6173 Knotts Creek Lane
Suffolk, VA 23435
Represented By
Paul Todd Sartwell
Dickerson & Smith Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Erika Chen
1501 Quail Point Road
Virginia Beach, VA 23454
Represented By
George Dillon, III
Anchor Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Anthony Michael Gantous
Anchor Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Wei Chen
1501 Quail Point Road
Virginia Beach, VA 23454
Represented By
George Dillon, III
Anchor Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Anthony Michael Gantous
Anchor Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Freedom Ford, Inc.
1800 Greenbrier Pkwy
Chesapeake, VA 23320
Represented By
Nicholas Anthony Mirra
Woods Rogers Plc (roanoke)
contact info
Joshua Forrest Pescud Long
Woods Rogers Vandeventer Black PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.
1800 Greenbrier Pkwy
Chesapeake, VA 23320
Represented By
Nicholas Anthony Mirra
Woods Rogers Plc (roanoke)
contact info
Joshua Forrest Pescud Long
Woods Rogers Vandeventer Black PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mark Joseph
Terminated: 12/06/2022
3301 Cullen Lane
Suffolk, VA 23435
Represented By
James Richard Theuer
James R. Theuer, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Patrick Mil
Terminated: 12/09/2022
8112 Mississippi Road
Laurel, MD 20724
Represented By
Justin Raimondo Burch
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
Erin Christine McDaniel
Davis Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 20, 2023
49 49 notice Notice (other) Fri 01/20 9:58 PM
NOTICE by Stacy Bennis(Sartwell, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stacey Bennis
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
48 48 notice Notice (other) Wed 01/04 10:39 AM
NOTICE by Erika Chen, Wei Chen of Filing Declarations(Dillon, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
47 47 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/04 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Dillon, III on behalf of Erika Chen, Wei Chen (Dillon, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
46 46 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction Tue 01/03 3:03 PM
Final Consent Order. The court shall retain exclusive personal and subject matter jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Final Consent Order and the terms of the Agreement entered into by the Parties in connection herewith. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 1/3/2023. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
45 45 notice Notice (other) Tue 12/27 3:30 PM
NOTICE by Erika Chen, Wei Chen of Appearance of Counsel George T. Dillon, III (Gantous, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
44 44 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/13 8:47 AM
Final Order as to Defendant Robert Patrick Mil. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/13/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
43 43 2 pgs motion Permanent Injunction Mon 12/12 5:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction Entry of Final Consent Order by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc..(Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Proposed Order Final Consent Order
Friday, December 09, 2022
42 42 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/09 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Only as to Defendant Robert Patrick Mil by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
41 41 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/06 2:25 PM
ORDER: All deadlines with respect to the motions currently pending before the Court are suspended until 12/12/22 to allow time for the parties to file a proposed consent order. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/6/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
40 40 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/06 2:17 PM
Final Order as to Defendant Mark Joseph. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/6/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/06 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Only as to Defendant Mark Joseph by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
38 38 2 pgs misc Status Report Mon 12/05 11:25 PM
STATUS REPORT Supplemental Joint by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
37 37 notice Request for Hearing Fri 11/18 5:20 PM
Request for Hearing by Robert Patrick Mil re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/10 3:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Patrick Mil. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
35 35 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Fri 11/04 4:33 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/02 3:46 PM
ORDER - The parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than Monday, December 5, 2022. The Court suspends all deadlines with respect to the pending motions except for Defendant Robert Mil's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 11/2/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
33 33 misc Status Report Tue 11/01 6:25 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Pursuant to Court's Order dated October 27, 2022 (ECF. No. 32) by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
32 32 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/27 4:50 PM
ORDER - The parties are DIRECTED to engage in mediation and file a joint status report no later than 11/28/2022. The Court suspends all deadlines with respect to the pending motions except Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed at ECF No. 23. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 10/27/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Status Conference Thu 10/27 2:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes: Status Conference held on 10/27/2022. Appearance of counsel for parties. Counsel answered questions of the Court. Court directs parties to mediate (with Magistrate Judge or private mediator). Joint Notice regarding status of mediation efforts due by 11/28/2022. Court suspends briefing as to all motions except Defendant Mil's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 23). Plaintiffs' required to respond to Motion (ECF 23) based on the standard deadlines. If parties decide to use private mediator, the parties are directed to meet and confer to determine who shall bear the cost of the private mediation. (Court Reporter J. Trail)(kgall)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/27 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Raimondo Burch on behalf of Robert Patrick Mil (Burch, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
misc Refer for 16 b Wed 10/26 3:54 PM
Refer for 16(b) (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 10/25 4:59 PM
Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. (kgall)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
29 29 notice Request for Hearing Mon 10/24 6:54 PM
Request for Hearing by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. re27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expedited (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
28 28 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 10/24 6:45 PM
Memorandum in Support re27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expedited filed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 10/24 6:40 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expedited by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc..(Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Logan Expert Report
26 26 respoth Brief in Support Mon 10/24 2:40 PM
Brief in Support to25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss filed by Mark Joseph.(Theuer, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark Joseph
25 25 motion Compel Mon 10/24 2:39 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss by Mark Joseph. (Theuer, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
24 24 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 10/21 3:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Patrick Mil. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 10/21 3:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Patrick Mil. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
22 22 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 10/20 8:39 PM
Memorandum in Support re21 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Stacy Bennis.(Sartwell, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Stacey Bennis,
Att: 2 Exhibit Employee Handbook
21 21 motion Stay Thu 10/20 8:36 PM
MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Stacy Bennis. (Sartwell, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion More Definite Statement Thu 10/20 8:35 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement by Stacy Bennis. (Sartwell, Paul)
Related: [-]
19 19 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 10/20 5:43 PM
Memorandum in Support re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Erika Chen, Wei Chen.(Gantous, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
18 18 motion Compel Thu 10/20 5:41 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue by Erika Chen, Wei Chen.(Gantous, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 07, 2022
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/07 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. Erika Chen served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022 (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 6:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. Mark Joseph served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022 (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 6:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. Stacy Bennis served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022 (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 6:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. Wei Chen served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022 (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Thu 10/06 6:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Robert Patrick Mil on 10/03/2022, filed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 6:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. Stacy Bennis served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022 (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 6:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. Wei Chen served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022 (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 09/30 9:29 AM
Five (5) Summonses Issued as to Stacy Bennis, Erika Chen, Wei Chen, Mark Joseph, Robert Patrick Mil, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Thursday, September 29, 2022
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/29 4:44 PM
Proposed Summons of Defendant Robert Patrick Mil by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/29 4:42 PM
Proposed Summons of Defendant Stacy Bennis by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/29 4:41 PM
Proposed Summons of Defendant Mark Joseph by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/29 4:40 PM
Proposed Summons of Defendant Erika Chen by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/29 4:39 PM
Proposed Summons of Defendant Wei Chen aka Robert Chen by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 09/29 4:07 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 09/29 4:06 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Freedom Ford, Inc.. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Forrest Pescud Long on behalf of Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc. (Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 3:57 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8592021.), filed by Freedom Ford, Inc., Priority Imports Battlefield, Inc..(Long, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 09/29 4:47 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
Related: [-]