Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-00126
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Last checked: Friday Sep 30, 2022 3:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Sami Hayyat (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan Ophardt, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/30/2022 3:52 AM EDT
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Sami Hayyat. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 9/29/2022. (eh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joshua Otey
2 2 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Sami Hayyat. (eh)
Related: [-]