Eny Mejia Rodriguez v. Dennys Reyes Molina
Original Case: 4:22-cv-00183
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-03048 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 30, 2022 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Eny Adamy Mejia Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 25 2024
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, Roger L. Wollman and Duane Benton AUTHORING JUDGE: Roger L. Wollman (PUBLISHED) [5376304] [22-3048] |
Docket last updated: 09/30/2022 3:21 AM CDT |
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5203240] 22-3048 (CMH) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, **SEALED** Order 9/17/2022, and Judgment 9/20/2022. [5203249] 22-3048 (CMH) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/08/2022. Appendix due 11/18/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina due 11/18/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5203251] 22-3048 (CMH) |
||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin Bergmann for Appellant Mr. Dennys Antonio Reyes Molina w/service 09/29/2022 [5203321] 22-3048 (BDB) |