Green v. Does
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian S Miller |
Referred: | Joe J Volpe |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00180 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2023 |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
John P Yates
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Green
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Transfer Case Email
Fri 05/12 8:09 AM
E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Southern District of Illinois, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 3:23-cv-01623. (jak) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Thu 05/11 4:19 PM
Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Illinois on 5/11/2023. (cmn) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/10 12:35 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer a copy of this Order and the original file of this Court to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois; and directing the Clerk to wait 30 days to effectuate the transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 04/10/2023. (llg) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 04/06 12:47 PM
ORDER rejecting18 Proposed Findings and Recommendations; and remanding this case to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe for consideration of Green's motion for leave to proceed in forma paupers as attached to Doc. No.19 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/6/2023. (ldb) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Wed 03/01 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re23 Notice of Change of Address. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of file mark) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry23 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 02/28 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re24 Objection. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry24 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/28 2:32 PM
OBJECTION to18 Report and Recommendations by Kevin Green. (kdr) (jak) |
|
Att: 1 (2/28/2023) Main Document - Correct | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 02/28 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Green. (kdr) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/27 11:32 AM
MOTION to Amend1 and12 Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kevin Green. (llg) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/27 11:21 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Kevin Green. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 01/24 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Green. (kdr) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/20 5:01 PM
MOTION to Amend1 12 Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kevin Green. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 01/12 3:41 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed without prejudice12 . No certificate of appealability be issued. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/12/2023. (lej) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Copies
Thu 01/12 3:32 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Petitioner's motion for copies15 . Petitioner's Petition is 111 pages long. However, he may return the copy for inspection by the Clerk's Office to determine if the copy mailed was flawed. If such a determination is made, a new copy will be mailed to Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/12/2023. (lej) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/12 2:55 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Kevin Green. (kdr) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Copies
Thu 01/12 2:53 PM
MOTION for Copies by Kevin Green. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 12/15 8:58 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (incomplete image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry12 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/13 11:49 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying as frivolous Petitioner's motion for order and motion for miscellaneous relief4 11 . Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis fails to provide the necessary information to grant in forma pauperis status under the statute. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. For Petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis, he must provide the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. The Court mailed Petitioner the necessary forms to complete this process. (Doc. No. 10.) Accordingly, his motion is denied without prejudice11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/13/2022. (lej) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/07 12:12 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kevin Green. [Docketed pursuant to10 Order] (jak) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/07 11:10 AM
ORDER directing Petitioner to file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 30 days of the date of this Order if he wishes to proceed with this action; directing the Clerk to mail to Petitioner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet; directing Petitioner to either pay the $5.00 statutory filing fee in full or file a properly completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet within 30 days of the date of this Order if he wishes to proceed with this action; and directing the Clerk to re-file what is currently filed as the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as a Miscellaneous Motion for Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/7/2022. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 12/12 4:39 PM
AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Green. Related document:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kevin Green.(kdr) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 11/23 11:37 AM
ORDER rejecting3 proposed findings and recommendations; and remanding this case to Judge Volpe for consideration of Green's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/23/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/16 4:08 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Kevin Green. (ldb) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/08 11:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Green. (kdr) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/25 1:18 PM
DISPOSITION by Kevin Green. (ldb) |
|
5 | 5
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 10/25 1:15 PM
OBJECTION to3 Proposed Findings and Recommendations and Request for Copies, by Kevin Green. (ldb) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 10/25 1:12 PM
MOTION for Order by Kevin Green. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 10/11 11:30 AM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed and the requested relief be denied1 . No certificate of appealability be issued. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/11/2022. (lej) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/11 10:55 AM
ORDER that the Clerk shall mail to Petitioner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either (1) pay the $5 statutory filing fee in full; or (2) file a properly completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. Failure to timely and properly comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice, pursuant to LR 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/11/2022. (lej) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 09/30 1:21 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Green. (ldb) |