Nomey et al v. Google LLC
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03581 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1333 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 22-06619 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 29, 2023 4:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
Google, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Bandaries
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Nomey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER GRANTING25 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/1/2023. (jls) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 02/01 10:34 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re25 Motion to Dismiss. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Case. Clerk took corrective action. (cs) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss For Voluntary Dismissal by Nathan Bandaries, Sandra Nomey.(Stag, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Google LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Stag, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER GRANTING22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the submission date for Defendant's18 Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Dismiss the Action is CONTINUED to February 22, 2023. Any memoranda in opposition to the motion must be filed pursuant to Local Rule 7.5. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/20/2022.(pp) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nathan Bandaries, Sandra Nomey. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld.(Liuzza, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Susan D. Fahringer. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/30/2022. (jls) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Samantha Vanessa Ettari-Contreras. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/30/2022. (jls) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sunita B. Bali. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/30/2022. (jls) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California or, in the Alternative, , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Google, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/28/2022.(Smith, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
17 | 17
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 11/30 10:59 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re11 ,12 , and13 MOTIONS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. **Documents have been marked as being filed in error and have been refiled at rec. docs. 14, 15, and 16.** (jls) |
|
16 | 16
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan D. Fahringer (Fee previously paid) by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samantha V. Ettari-Contreras (Fee previously paid) by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sunita B. Bali (Fee previously paid) by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() **ERROR - See rec. doc. 15 for corrected filing** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samantha V. Ettari-Contreras (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9675773) by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) Modified on 11/30/2022 (jls) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() **ERROR - See rec. doc. 14 for corrected filing** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sunita B. Bali (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9675735) by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) Modified on 11/30/2022 (jls) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() **ERROR - see rec. doc. 16 for corrected filing** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan D. Fahringer (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9675684) by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) Modified on 11/30/2022 (jls) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, as to Google, LLC. Defendant is granted an extension to November 30, 2022, to file responsive pleadings to the petition filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on October 20, 2022. (mp) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by Google, LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 10/19 10:13 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 5. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. (cs) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Compliance by Google, LLC re5 Order.(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, as to Google, LLC. Defendant is granted an additional 21 days to file responsive pleadings to the petition filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on October 4, 2022. (mp) |
|
5 | 5
![]() DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Google LLC. (cs) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 10/03 9:11 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' Complaint by Google LLC.(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC (Waxley, Taylor) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2022-06619 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9582196) filed by Google LLC.Attorney Taylor Rene Delrie Waxley added to party Google LLC(pty:dft).(Waxley, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |