Clement v. Higgins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00936 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Defendant
Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Ty Clement
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb) |
|
4 | 4
![]() JUDGMENT: Consistent with3 Order, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (ldb) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Clement's claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/31/2022. (ldb) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, an IFP application; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 09/30/2022. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ty Clement.(kdr) |