Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-02205
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2022 2:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Angel Sebastian-Modesto (1)
Represented By
Raymond Meza, Jr.
Law Office Of Ray Meza, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexander Eugene Brown
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/01/2022 2:59 AM CDT
Sunday, September 04, 2022
Arrest of Angel Sebastian-Modesto (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
Warrant Returned Executed as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto. (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto. (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto (1).By Judge Victor R. Garcia. (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto. (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto. (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Initial Appearance as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto held on 9/7/2022 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 9/12/2022 9:00AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - CLEVRIE.) (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (drda) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Angel Sebastian-Modesto (Meza, Raymond) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (bot2) [2:22-mj-02107-VRG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Angel Sebastian-Modesto (bot2)
Related: [-]